Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TRUSTCO BANK VS ANGEL RIVERA
On June 29, 2012 a fcl-homestead $50001-$249999 case was filed in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL. Judge ROBERT T BURGER presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 29, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Brevard County, FL
Category
FCL-HOMESTEAD $50001-$249999
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Judgment of Foreclosure
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS Event Code 5130-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21684139
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
August 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Event Code 5131-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21684143
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
ASM: JUDICIAL SALE FORECLOSURE Event Code 51-Event Seq 5
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE BID SHEET Event Code 10020-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21601704
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
CAL:FORECLOSURE SALE Event Code 3948-Event Seq 1
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
CR: JUDICIAL SALE HELD Event Code 4644-Event Seq 3
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Event Code 5132-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 21602570
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION REGARDING NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 7715-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21427616
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE >$50,000 AND <$250,000 RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 1486-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 21295128
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 6740-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 21324535
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 5
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 4
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT WORKSHEET Event Code 6606-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21295075
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
May 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND/OR MORTGAGE Event Code 6770-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20928725
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
ELECTRONICALLY FILED (E-FILED) NOTE AND MORTGAGE Event Code 10089-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 21034498
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21032511
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 21040549
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES Event Code 5739-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21030429
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS Event Code 5125-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 20573844
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT REGARDING FEES, TIME, AND-OR COSTS Event Code 5201-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 20573833
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Event Code 2922-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20573676
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS OR AMOUNT DUE Event Code 5183-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 20573838
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE Event Code 11567-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20573666
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE Event Code 11567-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20573661
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20299904
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20299922
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20299925
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK Event Code 2920-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20275840
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK Event Code 2920-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20275832
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK Event Code 2920-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20275833
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES Event Code 5739-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19939069
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 19845166
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19845153
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
August 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19695576
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
August 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19655456
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
August 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 19629374
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
August 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19629198
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
August 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19621748
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
August 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 19622175
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
August 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 19625028
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
August 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 19622470
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
August 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19615271
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
July 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 7
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
July 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 4
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
July 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 2
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
July 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 8
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
July 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 5
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
July 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 3
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
July 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 6
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
July 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 1
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
July 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FUNDS DUE TO CLERK OF COURT Event Code 5723-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19481477
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: CIR CIV PART PMT FEE CLK Event Code 3248-Event Seq 11
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM:FCL >50,000 < 250,000 Event Code 1310-Event Seq 6
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: CIRCUIT ADDITIONAL DEFS Event Code 46-Event Seq 9
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: LIS PENDENS - FIRST PAGE Event Code 2585-Event Seq 7
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET Event Code 1417-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 19481237
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS Event Code 9566-Event Seq 10
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 2561-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 19481234
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: INDEX RECORDING NAMES > 4 Event Code 1662-Event Seq 8
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 19481230
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 1
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
COVER SHEET Event Code 6507-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 19481225
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |