Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
WELLS FARGO VS T J JUSTICE
On April 30, 2012 a fcl-homestead $50001-$249999 case was filed in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL. Judge CHARLES G CRAWFORD presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 30, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Brevard County, FL
Category
FCL-HOMESTEAD $50001-$249999
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
DSB: REFUND BOND Event Code 1124-Event Seq 1
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION Event Code 4129-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 31012510
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Event Code 5131-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24939092
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENTS Event Code 5130-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 24939093
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Event Code 5132-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 24860848
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
ASM: JUDICIAL SALE FORECLOSURE Event Code 51-Event Seq 5
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
CR: JUDICIAL SALE HELD Event Code 4644-Event Seq 3
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE BID SHEET Event Code 10020-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 24872656
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
ASM: DOC STAMPS Event Code 10325-Event Seq 2
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
CAL:FORECLOSURE SALE Event Code 3948-Event Seq 1
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION REGARDING NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 7715-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24844848
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 6740-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24782589
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS Event Code 6670-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24427358
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Event Code 5176-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24416839
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS Event Code 6670-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24401666
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
CR: NON JURY TRIAL CONDUCTED Event Code 4394-Event Seq 6
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE >$50,000 AND <$250,000 RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 1486-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 24388420
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 7
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Event Code 6722-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 24388399
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO CANCEL Event Code 2940-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 24385968
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
CONSENT TO JUDGMENT Event Code 4925-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 24382441
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
CAL:NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 3902-Event Seq 1
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT REGARDING FEES, TIME, AND-OR COSTS Event Code 5201-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 24371279
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24371274
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT REGARDING FEES, TIME, AND-OR COSTS Event Code 5201-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 24371275
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST Event Code 6930-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24265485
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT Event Code 9720-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24206645
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY Event Code 1222-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24163344
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION Event Code 6849-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24137573
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER Event Code 5686-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23984784
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 4920-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23904616
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Event Code 5176-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23799770
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 6272-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23787808
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CASE SET FOR TRIAL Event Code 4652-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 23761670
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARD Event Code 4412-Event Seq 2
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
CAL:CASE MGMNT CONFERENCE Event Code 6075-Event Seq 1
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4962-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23750054
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
November 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION Event Code 9740-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23598967
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
NON-RESIDENT COST BOND Event Code 5679-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23549090
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING NON RESIDENT COST BOND Event Code 10264-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23549086
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
October 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 23474847
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
October 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Event Code 5176-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23474564
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
October 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4949-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23473952
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Event Code 9883-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 23445837
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING ASIDE Event Code 6456-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 23445774
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
CAL:CASE MGMNT CONFERENCE Event Code 6075-Event Seq 1
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARD Event Code 4412-Event Seq 3
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT Event Code 2986-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23433832
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Event Code 6720-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23401658
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23160384
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Event Code 9883-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23149261
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
CR: NO ACTION TAKEN Event Code 4449-Event Seq 2
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER Event Code 6322-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 23067155
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Event Code 6720-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23048612
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22878687
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING CANCELLED Event Code 4291-Event Seq 2
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING Event Code 6741-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22694588
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
CR: CASE MGMNT CONF CANCELLED Event Code 5738-Event Seq 3
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Event Code 6821-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 22656708
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
CAL:CASE MGMNT CONFERENCE Event Code 6075-Event Seq 1
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION Event Code 4945-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22666779
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT IN OPPOSITION Event Code 5194-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22662689
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22600474
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22572745
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Event Code 5176-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22507256
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Event Code 9883-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22496883
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
October 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF OPPOSITION Event Code 2479-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21909721
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND/OR MORTGAGE Event Code 6770-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21363715
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21266321
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 4920-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21282509
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO SET ASIDE Event Code 2957-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 21230875
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT Event Code 2986-Event Seq 2
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT Event Code 2986-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 21220252
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT Event Code 2986-Event Seq 4
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT Event Code 2986-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21212380
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 21225221
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 5
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20983370
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Event Code 6700-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20983362
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Event Code 6700-Event Seq 2
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21117732
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Event Code 6700-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21117572
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE Event Code 5170-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21388906
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Event Code 6720-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20916768
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT REGARDING FEES, TIME, AND-OR COSTS Event Code 5201-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21389142
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT REGARDING FEES, TIME, AND-OR COSTS Event Code 5201-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 21389147
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS OR AMOUNT DUE Event Code 5183-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21389124
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE Event Code 11567-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 21389165
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21389096
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Event Code 2922-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20783675
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
October 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19929827
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
October 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 2
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
October 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 4304-Event Seq 4
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
October 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 4304-Event Seq 6
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
October 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 4304-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 19916685
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
October 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 4304-Event Seq 5
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
October 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK Event Code 2920-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 19913217
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
October 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE Event Code 11567-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19913211
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
June 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 19431179
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
June 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19429186
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
June 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 19429259
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
June 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 19429252
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
June 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 19431175
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
June 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 19429260
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 4
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 6
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 2
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 3
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 1
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 5
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 2561-Event Seq 9-Barcode ID 19187645
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET Event Code 1417-Event Seq 10-Barcode ID 19187646
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 19187644
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: LIS PENDENS - ADDTL PAGE Event Code 2587-Event Seq 3
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: CIRCUIT ADDITIONAL DEFS Event Code 46-Event Seq 5
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 6
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
COVER SHEET Event Code 6507-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 19187641
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: LIS PENDENS - FIRST PAGE Event Code 2585-Event Seq 2
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM:FCL >50,000 < 250,000 Event Code 1310-Event Seq 1
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS Event Code 9566-Event Seq 4
Judge: CHARLES G CRAWFORD |