Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BANK AMERICA VS GISELA LYNCH
On April 06, 2012 a fcl-homestead $50001-$249999 case was filed in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL. Judge LISA DAVIDSON presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 06, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Brevard County, FL
Category
FCL-HOMESTEAD $50001-$249999
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Dismissal
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
CAL:CASE MGMNT CONFERENCE Event Code 6075-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
CR: CASE MGMNT CONF CANCELLED Event Code 5738-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING Event Code 6741-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22027053
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING Event Code 6741-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21986820
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Event Code 6722-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21955942
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6229-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21955941
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
October 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Event Code 9883-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21926737
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
July 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19172315
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 19175278
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 19175262
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET Event Code 1417-Event Seq 10-Barcode ID 19089130
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 19089127
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 2561-Event Seq 9-Barcode ID 19089129
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 6
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM:FCL >50,000 < 250,000 Event Code 1310-Event Seq 1
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: LIS PENDENS - FIRST PAGE Event Code 2585-Event Seq 2
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS Event Code 9566-Event Seq 4
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: INDEX RECORDING NAMES > 4 Event Code 1662-Event Seq 5
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
COVER SHEET Event Code 6507-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 19089123
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: LIS PENDENS - ADDTL PAGE Event Code 2587-Event Seq 3
Judge: LISA DAVIDSON |