Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
WELLS FARGO VS TERRY LOCY
On April 06, 2012 a fcl-homestead $50001-$249999 case was filed in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL. Judge GEORGE W. MAXWELL III presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 06, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Brevard County, FL
Category
FCL-HOMESTEAD $50001-$249999
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Active
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED Event Code 7693-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22112623
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED Event Code 7691-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER DIRECTING CLERK Event Code 6317-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22003965
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
ALL REOPEN COMPL EVENTS CLOSED Event Code 3579-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
October 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN FILING UPDATED Event Code 2802-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
October 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION Event Code 2992-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21974565
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Event Code 899-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21556494
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO AMEND CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 935-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21546616
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
ALL REOPEN COMPL EVENTS CLOSED Event Code 3579-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION OR PETITION TO AMEND Event Code 2970-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21516238
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
REOPEN FILING UPDATED Event Code 2802-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
DSB: REFUND BOND Event Code 1124-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO THIRD PARTY Event Code 4472-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21265900
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS Event Code 5149-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21265932
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE Event Code 5132-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20851890
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
ASM: JUDICIAL SALE FORECLOSURE Event Code 51-Event Seq 5
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
CAL:FORECLOSURE SALE Event Code 3948-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE BID SHEET Event Code 10020-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 20851940
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
CR: JUDICIAL SALE HELD Event Code 4644-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION REGARDING NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 7715-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20779362
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 6740-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20781439
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Event Code 6722-Event Seq 10-Barcode ID 20652463
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE >$50,000 AND <$250,000 RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 1486-Event Seq 9-Barcode ID 20652461
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 11
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT Event Code 5134-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 20652453
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT REGARDING FEES, TIME, AND-OR COSTS Event Code 5201-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 20652446
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
WITNESS TESTIMONY LOG Event Code 7422-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20652407
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
CAL:NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 3902-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
CR: NON JURY TRIAL CONDUCTED Event Code 4394-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT REGARDING FEES, TIME, AND-OR COSTS Event Code 5201-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 20652451
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE COVERSHEET WITH LOAN DOCUMENTS Event Code 10124-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 20652439
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Event Code 6720-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 20652428
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT LIST Event Code 6110-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20509921
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20509915
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST Event Code 6841-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20509903
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
February 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NON JURY TRIAL Event Code 6272-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20476075
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON-JURY TRIAL Event Code 6818-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20457087
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20365838
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE Event Code 11567-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20333818
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6734-Event Seq 4
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6734-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20333832
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6734-Event Seq 7
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES Event Code 5739-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 20333841
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK Event Code 2920-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20333813
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6734-Event Seq 5
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6734-Event Seq 6
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19234938
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19220583
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 19206953
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19201218
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 19201222
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 5
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 3
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 4
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET Event Code 1417-Event Seq 10-Barcode ID 19089081
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 2561-Event Seq 9-Barcode ID 19089080
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 19089078
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS Event Code 9566-Event Seq 5
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM:FCL >50,000 < 250,000 Event Code 1310-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: LIS PENDENS - ADDTL PAGE Event Code 2587-Event Seq 3
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 6
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: CIRCUIT ADDITIONAL DEFS Event Code 46-Event Seq 4
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
COVER SHEET Event Code 6507-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 19089076
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: LIS PENDENS - FIRST PAGE Event Code 2585-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |