Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CITIBANK VS DIANE K NOLAN
On April 11, 2012 a contract & indebtedness case was filed in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL. Judge GEORGE W. MAXWELL III presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 11, 2012
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2021
Filing Location
Brevard County, FL
Category
CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Closed
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION RETURNED SERVED Event Code 7668-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 25479376
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Event Code 4603-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 25288500
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM RETURNED UNSERVED Event Code 7669-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23909189
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Event Code 4603-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23706820
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
August 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 3
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
August 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 5620-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 21719457
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
August 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 4
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
August 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21503597
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
July 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21485720
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Event Code 2922-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20786290
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION Event Code 4132-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20786267
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20786269
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Event Code 2931-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20788148
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION Event Code 4132-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20787992
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20787995
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 20260003
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4930-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20259995
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6739-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 20259998
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20259992
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
June 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE Event Code 5102-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19337393
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
June 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19337227
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 19323433
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED Event Code 10113-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION Event Code 4132-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 19135192
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 6
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 19135178
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
COVER SHEET Event Code 6507-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 19135172
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE Event Code 2138-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
April 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
ASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS Event Code 9566-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |