Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CACH vs Michael Ramirez Sr/CC
A 09 Limited - Rule 3.740 Collections Under $10,000 case was filed by Cach, Llc, represented by Vos, Ryan E., against Ramirez, Michael, Sr, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge Silva, Phillip presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 19, 2011
Last Refreshed
December 10, 2021
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Category
09 Limited - Rule 3.740 Collections Under $10,000
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 After Settlement | |
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case returned to the warehouse returned to archives mn |
|
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
CRC 3.1385 After Settlement
Judge: Silva, Phillip |
|
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Off calendar for 11/18/13 due to dismissal entered. cg | |
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed with prejudice. *****dismissal/box 130****** cg Event: Dismissal filed. |
|
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
CRC 3.1385 After Settlement
Judge: Silva, Phillip |
|
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for continuance granted Court continues 225 hearing set for 11-14-13 to 11-18-13 at 1:00pm in room 104 due to court closure of Selma Court. mn |
|
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of mailing I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the Notice of Calendar Setting was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on 03-29-13. Parties served: Ryan E. Vos mn |
|
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cal Setting Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 29-MAR-2013 by MNEANG. |
|
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of CRC 225 Hrng Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 19-MAR-2012 by THOWLETT. |
|
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Matter set for hearing Matter set for on 11/14/13 at 1:30pm in dept Selma. th |
|
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Off calendar for scheduled for . | |
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of settlement filed Notice of settlement of entire action filed pursuant to CRC 3.1385. Dismissal to be filed by: 09/13/13 th |
|
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
POS of summons & comp personal Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Michael Ramirez SR. on 12/30/11. lc |
|
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLSE12016. |
|
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Decl for Reduction of Fee Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff. |
|
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740 Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. |
|
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration filed Declaration of venue filed. |
|
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion th Event: New Civil Case Filed |
|
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. th Event: Comp filed reduced fee |