Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Marvin L Olin vs Craig Eischen
A 47 Small Claims $0 - $1,500 case was filed by Olin, Marvin L, against Eischen, Craig, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge Fain, Gregory presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 13, 2011
Last Refreshed
December 10, 2021
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Category
47 Small Claims $0 - $1,500
Practice Area
Small Claims
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of judgment-full Acknowledgement of full satisfaction of judgment filed ER . |
|
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Marvin L Olin appearing in propria persona. vs Event: Party appearing |
|
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Fain Minute Order from Dept.: Clov Clerk: V. Salazar Reporter: 9:42:41 Nature of Hearing: Small Claims Court Trial vs |
|
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice sent Docket entry for the letter produced from CDADOCT on 03-AUG-2011 by VSALAZAR. |
|
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment for plaintiff Court orders judgment entered on 08/03/11. Defendant Craig Eischen shall pay plaintiff Marvin L Olin $1,559.00 and $90.00 costs, total judgment $1,649.00 on plaintiff's claim. vs |
|
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Craig Eischen appearing in propria persona. vs Event: Party appearing |
|
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment SC Notice of Entry of Judgment mailed on 08/03/11 to ALL PARTIES. vs |
|
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Fain, Gregory |
|
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 03-AUG-2011 by VSALAZAR. |
|
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Small Claims case referred to Mediation; an agreement was not reached. vs Event: Referral to Mediation SC |
|
July 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Pltf's claim served Plaintiff's claim returned to court served as to Craig Eischen and filed. Cost $40.00 psn . |
|
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$50.00 was made on receipt CLCL35364. |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Event: New Civil Case Filed |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Pltf's claim personal service Plaintiff's claim given to plaintiff for personal service . |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Pltfs claim and order filed Plaintiff's Claim and Order filed. Matter set for court trial on 08/03/11 at 8:00am in Dept #1. vs |