Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Nishell Lee Johnson etal vs Sierra Meadows Apt/dis
A 47 Small Claims $0 - $1,500 case was filed by Barrios, Kimberly Rae, and Johnson, Nishell Lee, against Sierra Meadows Apartments, L.P, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge CONVERSION, JUDGE presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 30, 2011
Last Refreshed
December 07, 2021
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Judge
Hon. CONVERSION, JUDGE
Category
47 Small Claims $0 - $1,500
Practice Area
Small Claims
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Judge, Pro Tempore |
|
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal SC Request for Dismissal Small Claims. Entire action of all parties and all causes of action, without prejudice. th. |
|
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Off calendar for Court Trial scheduled for 08/11/11. Dismissal Entered. th. | |
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Pltf's Claim - Proof Defective Plaintiff's claim returned to court and filed as to Mark Johnson Sierra Meadow ap, Richard F. Spenser . Proof of service defective or incomplete: Defective due to Server listed his own name as person served, server also marked serve plaintiff claim and a defendant claim, server marked both personal and sub service with sub service there was no mail date or location marked. On the declaration from server server listed he server four defendants only have one defendant listed on originally claim. Cost $75.00 hf |
|
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Event: New Civil Case Filed |
|
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Plaintiff's Claim and Order filed. Matter set for court trial on 8-11-11 at 8:45 in Dept #404 ph Event: Pltf's claim & order filed |
|
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$30.00 was made on receipt SCCE53529. |
|
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Pltf's claim personal service Plaintiff's claim given to plaintiff for personal service . disinterested party ph |