Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Lloyd C Macklin lll & Kayveon D Macklin (GUARD/P)
A Guardianship case was filed by (Subcribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge Kazanjian, Debra presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 13, 2011
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Category
Guardianship
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Guardianship,Conservatorship
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Case Duration
7 months and 20 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Continued Hearing by Court Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person (Prob. C. 1510) Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Cardoza Dept: 303 Judge: Jane Cardoza Clerk: T. Avina Hearing: Petition for Visitation. The Court notes that the petitioner is not present. The Court takes the matter off calendar. tl 122214 |
|
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Filed declaration Declaration: See attached /s/Mary McRae 111214 jmo |
|
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Filed declaration Declaration: See Attached /s/ JoAnn Small 111214 jmo |
|
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Kazanjian Minute Order from Dept.: 303 Clerk: Tiffany Lankford Reporter: Nature of Hearing: Petition for Visitation Examiner notes handed in open court; matter continued for the defects to be cured. The Court orders that the child is not to be exposed to any direct or indirect cigarette or cigar smoke. cont to 121714 900 303 tl 111214 |
|
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardianship of the Person (Prob. C. 2250)
Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Filed declaration Declaration: See Attached /s/ Deborrah Smith 1112114 jmo |
|
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Filed declaration Declaration: see attached /s/ Deborrah Smith 111214 jmo |
|
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of hearing filed Notice of hearing of Visitation filed. Hearing set on 11/12/14 at 9:00 am in Dept. 303 102814 jmo |
|
October 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Petition for Visitation. Hearing set for 11/12/14 at 9:00am in Dept. 303. no o's jfr 100914 Event: Motion filed |
|
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Agreement reached through mediation provided by Fresno Pacific University Mediation Services kc 011514 | |
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Oliver Minute Order from Dept.: 303 Clerk: Teresa Avina Reporter: NR Nature of Hearing: Petition for Visitation Also present in the courtroom is Deborrah Macklin. The Court dismisses the petition without prejudice. Parties agree to participate in mediation today at 10:30 a.m. regarding visitation. Petition is dismissed without prejudice before Court Trial. Amm 01/15/14 |
|
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person (Prob. C. 1510)
Judge: Oliver, Robert |
|
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Filed declaration Declaration /s/ Ruby Louise Miller kc 011714 |
|
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Filed declaration Declaration /s/ Deborrah Smith kc 010714 |
|
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Filed declaration Declaration /s/ Sylvester Smith kc 011713 |
|
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order granting waiver of fees Order granting waiver of court fees and costs signed by filed. cd 11-13-13 |
|
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Petition for Visitation Hearing 1-9-14 at 9am in Dept 303 cd 11-13-13 Event: Motion filed |
|
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. cd 11-13-13 Event: App for waiver of court fees |
|
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Petitioner not represented by an attorney at time of filing of Petition or Subsequent Petition. cd 11-13-13 Event: Petitioner in Pro Per |
|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Oliver Minute Order from Dept.: 303 Clerk: T. Avina Reporter: NR Nature of Hearing: Probate Status Hearing Re: Visitation The Court is informed that everything is going well. The Court indicates to the parties that it is not signing the mediation agreement at this time. tca 5/2/13 |
|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Probate Status Hearing Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person (Prob. C. 1510) Judge: Oliver, Robert |
|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Filed declaration [Confidential] Declaration (see attached records) /s/ Deborrah Smith jfr 4/29/13 |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Confidential Investigator's Report to Court - Supplemental Report pr 4/25/13 Event: Supp. Investigator Report |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Probate Guard Invg Fee Waived Confidential Investigator's Report to Court: Fee wavier 4/25/13 |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Julie Negrete investigated Confidential Investigator's Report to Court: Investigator 4/25/13 |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Reports sent out for case Investigation report filed. 4/25/13 |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Interview Subject 6 Date of interview: Person Interviewed: pr 4/25/13 |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
15 hour investigation Number of hours expended on investigation: pr 4/25/13 |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Supplemental report investigation. pr 4/25/13 | |
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conversion Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person (Prob. C. 1510) Judge: Oliver, Robert |
|
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Oliver Minute Order from Dept.: 303 Clerk: K. Clugston Reporter: NR Nature of Hearing: Petition for Termination of Guardianship The Court orders Visitation with parents every other Saturday from 10am to 3pm starting this Saturday. There is to be no ill speaking of each other in front of children. All other orders Regarding transportation are still in effect. Investigator is to do further investigation on the well being of children. The court waives confidentiality and has permission to receive all doctor/therapist reports. Parents address is 3741 N. Abby #202, Fresno, CA 93726, 559-417-6759. Set on 5/2/13 at 9am in Dept 303 for Status Re Visitation Petition is denied kc 031913 |
|
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Conversion Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardianship of the Person (Prob. C. 2250) Judge: Oliver, Robert |
|
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Oliver Minute Order from Dept.: 303 Clerk: T. Avina Reporter: NR Nature of Hearing: Petition for Termination of Guardianship Continued to 3/14/13 @ 9:00 a.m. Dept. 303 tca 2/14/13 |
|
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Any Comment Continuance Lloyd C Macklin lll & Kayveon D Macklin (GUARD/P) Case #: 11CEPR00512 Deboarh Macklin & Lloyd Macklin requested case be continued Original Hrg 2/14/13 at 9am in Dept 303 New Hrg 3/14/13 at 9am in Dept 303 Fax confirmation received. This is the second continuance by party for this matter. jfr 2/13/13 |
|
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of hearing filed Notice of hearing of To terminate guardianship of Lloyd Macklin and Kayveon Macklin filed. Hearing set on 2/14/13at 9am in 303 . kc 020813 |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Petition - Terminate Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardianship of the Person (Prob. C. 2250) Judge: Oliver, Robert |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Oliver Minute Order from Dept.: 303 Clerk: T. Avina Reporter: NR Nature of Hearing: Petition for Termination of Guardianship. Continued to 2/14/13 at the request of the Petitioner. Continued to 2/14/13 at 9:00am in Dept. 303. jfr 1/25/13 |
|
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Reports sent out for case Investigation report filed. pr 1/10/13 |
|
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Dina Calvillo investigated Confidential Investigator's Report to Court: Investigator pr 1/10/13 |
|
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Probate Guard Invg Fee Waived Confidential Investigator's Report to Court: Fee wavier pr 1/10/13 |
|
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Confidential Investigator's Report to Court - Supplemental Report pr 1/10/13 Event: Supp. Investigator Report |
|
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Interview Subject 1 Date of interview: Person Interviewed: pr 1/10/13 |
|
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Supplemental report investigation. pr 1/10/13 | |
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
8 hour investigation Number of hours expended on investigation: pr 1/10/13 |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Any Comment Macklin Case #: 11CEPR00512 Lloyd Macklin & Deborrah Macklin requests case be continued Original Hrg 1/17/13 at 9am in Dept 303 New Hrg 2/14/13 at 9am in Dept 303 |
|
November 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Agreement reached through mediation provided by Fresno Pacific University Mediation Services jfr 2/11/13 | |
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Any Comment Orders submitted at time of filing. Placed with submitted orders for 1/17/13 hearing. jfr 11/14/12 |
|
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Agree to Mediation Services Parties agree to attend mediation provided by Fresno Pacific University Mediation Services 03/26/13 |
|
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order granting waiver of fees Order granting waiver of court fees and costs signed by Judge Robert Oliver filed. jfr 11/15/12 |
|
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Oliver Minute Order from Dept.: 303 Clerk: T. Avina Reporter: NR Nature of Hearing: Petition for Termination of Guardianship The Court finds that terminating the guardianship is not in the best interest of the children at this time. The petition is denied. Parties agree to participate in mediation regarding vistation on 11/27/12 at 2:00 p.m. Petition denied. tca 11/14/12 |
|
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Petition for Termination of Guardianship. Hearing set for 1/17/13 at 9:00am in Dept. 303. jfr 11/14/12 Event: Motion filed |
|
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Petitioner not represented by an attorney at time of filing of Petition or Subsequent Petition. jfr 11/14/12 Event: Petitioner in Pro Per |
|
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mediation Referral ________________ Mediation referral provided to parties cd 11-14-12 |
|
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. jfr 11/14/12 Event: App for waiver of court fees |
|
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Conversion Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person (Prob. C. 1510) Judge: Oliver, Robert |
|
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Interview Subject 2 Date of interview: Person Interviewed: pr 11/7/12 |
|
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Dina Calvillo investigated pr 11/7/12 |
|
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Supplemental report investigation. pr 11/7/12 | |
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Reports sent out for case Investigation report filed. pr 11/7/12 |
|
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Probate Guard Invg Fee Waived Confidential Investigator's Report to Court: Fee wavier pr 11/7/12 |
|
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Confidential Investigator's Report to Court - Supplemental Report pr 11/7/12 Event: Supp. Investigator Report |
|
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Confidential Court Investigator Review Report Number of hours expended on investigation: pr 11/7/12 |
|
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filed declaration Declaration w/ attachments (10 pgs). /s/ Deborrah L. Smith. jfr 10/31/12 |
|
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Petition - Terminate Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person (Prob. C. 1510) Judge: Oliver, Robert |
|
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Oliver Minute Order from Dept.: 303 Clerk: T. Avina Reporter: NR Nature of Hearing: Petition for Termination of Guardianship Continued to 11/14/12 at the request of the Petitioner. Continued to 11/14/12 @ 9:00 a.m. Dept. 303 tca 10/30/12 |
|
October 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of hearing filed Notice of hearing to Revoke Guardianship filed. Hearing set on 11/14/12 at 8:30 in (Blank). jfr 10/26/12 |
|
September 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Any Comment Continuance Lloyd C Macklin lll & Kayveon D Macklin (GUARD/P) Lloyd C. Macklin, petitioner, appeared at the front counter and requests Petition for Termination be continued. Original Hrg 10/30/2012 at 9am in Dept 303 New Hrg 11/14/2012 at 9am in Dept 303 jfr 9/13/12 |
|
August 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. Event: App for waiver of court fees |
|
August 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Petitioner not represented by an attorney at time of filing of Petition or Subsequent Petition. cd 8-31-12 Event: Petitioner in Pro Per |
|
August 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order granting waiver of fees Order granting waiver of court fees and costs signed by filed. cd 8-31-12 |
|
August 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Petition for Termination of Guardianship Hearing 10-30-12 at 9am in Dept 303 cd 8-31-12 Event: Motion filed |
|
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardianship of the Person (Prob. C. 2250)
Judge: Oliver, Robert |
|
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Nunez Minute Order from Dept.: 303 Clerk: T. Avina Reporter: W. Saffery Nature of Hearing: Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person (Prob. C. 1510) The Court grants the petition. Visitation with the paternal grandmother to be at the discretion of the guardian. Petition granted. Order signed before court trial. tca 2/1/12 |
|
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order b/f trial grant-Person Order before trial granting guardianship/conservatorship of Person - see Order filed 2-1-2012. rkb 2/1/2012 |
|
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Order Appointing Guardian of Minor, appointing Deborrah Smith as guardian of the persons of Lloyd C Macklin III and Kayveon D Macklin, /s/ Judge Ralph Nunez, 2-1-2012. rkb 2/1/2012 Event: Order to appoint |
|
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Letters person only Issued Letters of Person only, appointing Deborrah Smith as guardian of the persons of Lloyd C Macklin III and Kayveon D Macklin. rkb 2/1/2012 |
|
January 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filed declaration Declaration kc 012712 |
|
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Confidential Court Investigator Review Report Number of hours expended on investigation: |
|
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Reports sent out for case Investigation report filed. |
|
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Confidential Investigator's Report to Court - Initial Review jfr 1/25/12 Event: General G/S, C/S Investigator |
|
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Interview Subject 4 Date of interview: Person Interviewed: |
|
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Dina Calvillo investigated | |
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Gen Petition Invest. Performed | |
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Probate Guard Invg Fee Waived jfr 1/25/12 |
|
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of hearing filed Notice of hearing of Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian filed. Hearing set on 12-15-11 at 9am in Dept 303 . cd 1-23-12 |
|
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of hearing filed Notice of hearing of Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person filed. Hearing set on 2-1-12 at 9am in Dept 303 . cd 1-23-12 |
|
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of service . cd 1-23-12 | |
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filed declaration Declaration of Due Diligence kc 011112 |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of hearing filed Notice of Hearing of Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person Hearing is set for 2/1/12, 9:00 a.m., Dept. 303 rkb 12/30/2011 |
|
December 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Oliver Minute Order from Dept.: 303 Clerk: Teresa Avina Reporter: Wendy Saffery Nature of Hearing: Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardianship of the Person (Prob. C. 2250) The Court is informed that father Lloyd Macklin, Jr. is in Wasco State Prison. The Court grants the petition. The temporary expires on 2/1/12. The General Hearing remains set for 2/1/12. Petition is granted. Order signed before Court Trial. Temporary Guardianship/Conservatorship Letters extended to: 2/1/12 121911 jmo |
|
December 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Temporary Guardianship/Conservatorship Appointment Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardianship of the Person (Prob. C. 2250) Judge: Oliver, Robert |
|
December 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Temporary letters Issued letters of temporary guardianship, appointing Deborrah Smith as guardian of the person of Lloyd C. Macklin III & Kayveon D. Macklin. Letters expire 2-1-2012. rkb 12/15/2011 |
|
December 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Temp G/S, C/S Person Grant Order Appointing Temporary Guardian, appointing Deborrah Smith as guardian of the person of Lloyd C. Macklin, III & Kayveon D. Macklin, /s/ Judge Robert Oliver, 12-15-2011. Order expires 2/1/2012. rkb 12/15/2011 |
|
December 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of hearing filed AMENDED Notice of hearing of Petition for Appointment filed. Hearing set on 2/1/12 at 9am in 303 . kc 121611 |
|
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of hearing filed Notice of hearing of Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardianship filed. Hearing set on 12/15/11 at 9:00am in Dept. 303. jfr 12/12/11 |
|
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of hearing filed Notice of hearing of Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person filed. Hearing set on 2/1/12 at 9:00am in Dept. 303. jfr 12/12/11 |
|
December 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Filed Declaration of Due Diligence as to Lloyd Clifford Macklin, /s/ Deborrah Smith, 12-7-2011. rkb 12/9/2011 | |
December 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of hearing filed Notice of Hearing of Petition for Appiontment of Temporary Conservatorship Hearing is set for 12/15/11, 9:00 a.m., Dept. 303 rkb 12/9/2011 |
|
December 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of hearing filed Notice of Hearing of Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Minor Hearing is set for 2/1/12, 9:00 a.m., Dept. 303 rkb 12/9/2011 |
|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardianship of the Person (Prob. C. 2250) Hearing 12/15/11 at 9am in Dept 303 kc 120211 Event: Pet For Temp. G/S, C/S-Person |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. kc 112911 Event: App for waiver of court fees |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Duties and liabilities filed. kc 112911 | |
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Petitioner not represented by an attorney at time of filing of Petition or Subsequent Petition. kc 112911 Event: Petitioner in Pro Per |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Confdntl Screen frm cons/gu Confidential Guardianship Screening Form kc 112911 |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Any Comment ORDERS and LETTERS SUBMITTED FOR HEARING ON 2/1/12 kc 112911 |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Uniform custody juris Filed declaration under uniform child custody jurisdiction act. Child/ren residence for past 6 months: and period of residence: kc 112911 |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order granting waiver of fees Order granting waiver of court fees and costs signed by clerk filed. kc 112911 |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person (Prob. C. 1510) Hearing 2/1/12 at 9am in Dept 303 kc 112911 Event: Guard Pet Person Only No Fee |
|
August 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person (Prob. C. 1510)
Judge: Oliver, Robert |
|
July 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Dismissal - Voluntary ismissal - Voluntary - Dismissal entered as requested on 7-15-11, Without prejudice, entire action of all parties and all causes of action. cd 7-15-11 |
|
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Temporary Guardianship/Conservatorship Appointment Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person (Prob. C. 1510) Judge: Oliver, Robert |
|
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge Oliver Minute Order from Dept.: 303 Clerk: T Avina Reporter: W Saffery Nature of Hearing:Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardianship of the Person ( Probate Code 2250) The Petitioner advises the Court that the mother has the children. The Court advises the Petitioner that the mother and father need to be served. The petition is denied The General Hearing remains set for 8/11/11 petition is denied lr 6/27/11 |
|
June 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order granting waiver of fees Order granting waiver of court fees and costs signed by Clerk filed. ab 061411 |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Duties and liabilities filed. ab 061411 | |
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person (Prob. C. 1510) Hearing set for: 8/11/11 at 9:00 a.m. in Dept 303 ab 061411 Event: Guard Pet Person Only No Fee |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Petitioner not represented by an attorney at time of filing of Petition or Subsequent Petition. ab 061411 Event: Petitioner in Pro Per |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardianship/Conservatorship of the Person (Prob. C. 2250) Hearing set for: 6/27/11 at 9:00 a.m. in Dept 303 ab 061411 Event: Pet For Temp. G/S, C/S-Person |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Confdntl Screen frm cons/gu Confidential Guardianship/Conservatorship Screening Form ab 061411 |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. ab 061411 Event: App for waiver of court fees |