Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Sylvia Rodriguez vs Santos Rodriguez
A Dissolution - No Children case was filed by Rodriguez, Sylvia, against Rodriguez, Santos, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge CONVERSION, JUDGE presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 05, 2011
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Judge
Hon. CONVERSION, JUDGE
Category
Dissolution - No Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
2 years, 3 months and 20 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application/Order for Restoration of Former Name Former Name Restored To: "Silvia Alvarado" - Original to file - conformed mailed in SASE to petitioner |
|
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to FLEX- ex parte for restoration of former name (w/o file) |
|
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Withdraw of Attorney Attorney Withdrawing: |
|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default or Uncontested Disso or Legal Sep | |
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Judgment on Reserved issues. |
|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Appearance Stipulation and Waiver | |
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Declaration of Susan Hemb |
|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Waiver Final Declaration of Disclosure | |
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Unavailability for 10/29/15, 10/30/15, 11/23/15 through and including 11/27/15, 12/21/15 through and including 1/1/16 |
|
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Documents sent to sent Judgment to FLEX for Review |
|
March 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Historical Documents DMS Conversion Documents |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Scanned FL Ret Family Law Judgment Date: 3-26-2014 Scanned Date: 6-10-14 ab 61014 |
|
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: outbox in Self-Help for scanning on 2nd Floor. 4/2/14 cv | |
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Status Only Judgment for Status Only. Marital termination date 3/26/14. 4/2/14 cv |
|
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Document sent to Judgment signed 3/26/14. Notice of Entry of Judgment sent via mail to each party. All other documents to be placed in runner box #1 for pick-up. 4/2/14 cv |
|
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Stipulation-No Fees Stipulation and Order to Bifurcate Dissolution of Marriage to obtain status only judgment. 4/2/14 cv |
|
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration filed Declaration filed. 4/2/14 cv |
|
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of judgment filed. 4/2/14 cv | |
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: FLEX shelf for Judgment Review. Date on Shelf 2/13/14 mp 2/13/14 | |
February 05, 2014 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: Judgment to FLEX dc 2/12/14 | |
February 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Appear, Stips & Waivrs-No Fees Respondent has made a previous general appearance dc 2/12/14 |
|
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judge's return letter or note Documents returned: Judgment "Status Only" Reason: Form # FL-130 needs to be signed by all parties with appropriate boxes marked. In addition appropriate "Status Only" language for #3. Form # FL-170 needs to be completed with Box #17 marked. Form # FL-180 (Judgment) should have box for #2 marked stating "By declaration under FC 2336. This harmonizes with Form # FL-170. Per Form # FL-347 #1 no stipulation has been provided concerning preliminary declaration of disclosure. Thus both parties need to submit Form FL # 141. Judge: FLEX Date: 01.22.14 - All papers returned to Box #1 - FF to FL Shelf 2nd Floor - jrh 1.22.2014 |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event | File forwarded to:FLEX Shelf for Judgment Review. Date on Shelf 1/08/14. mp 1/08/14 | |
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Document sent to Stipulation and Order to Bifurcate Dissolution of Marriage to Obtain Status Only Judgment sent to FLEX dc 1/7/14 |
|
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$20.00 was made on receipt FLCE216735. |
|
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event | A Stipulation and order not requiring a hearing, request or stipulation for continuance of hearing. Stipulation and Order to Bifurcate Dissolution of Marriage to Obtain Status Only Judgment submitted with ck #1530 for $20.00. dc 1/7/14 | |
August 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Minute order Jud Nystrom-Geist Minute order from Dept: 202 Clerk: D. Hooper Reporter: NR Nature of Hearing: Fee Waiver Ptnr not present Resp sworn/present in Pro Per. Court hears testimony from Mr. Rodriguez. Court grants the fee waiver. dah 8/9/13 |
|
August 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Waiver of Fees Order signed Yes dah 8/9/13 |
|
August 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Fee Waiver 11CEFL07408 hrg set for Resp Notice of hearing about court fees. Hearing set: 7/25/13dbs Date: 8-9-2013 Time: 9:00am Dept 202 Judge: Nystrom-Geist, Kimberly |
|
August 09, 2013 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: FL Sr. /jf/ for processing fee waiver dah 8/9/13 | |
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Req for hearing about waiver Request for hearing about court fee waiver order. 7/25/13dbs |
|
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of hearing about waiver Notice of hearing about court fees. Hearing set: 7/25/13dbs Date: 8-9-2013 Time: 9:00am Dept 202 |
|
July 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order denying waiver of fees Order denying waiver of court fees and costs signed by Judge Corona filed. Mailed Request For Hearing. Cannot submit new information. Must either pay fee or Request A Hearing - FF to desk of FL SR JA for tracking - jrh 7.22.13 |
|
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event | File forwarded to: FLEX Req for FEE Waiver w/Response for approval ms 7/19/13 | |
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Proof of service of Response to disso marr, Req for fee waiver filed. Served on Sylvia Rodriguez by pers on 7/18/13. ms 7/19/13 |
|
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Rsp Pet Dis Mar-no chld-No Fee Resp to disso marr, w/no minor children ms 7/19/13 |
|
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Defendant(s)/Respondent(s) in propria persona ms 7/19/13 Event: Deft/Resp in Propria Persona |
|
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. ms 7/19/13 Event: App for waiver of court fees |
|
December 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of service-Summons filed Proof of service of Summons on Family Law: Petition, Summons, blank Response, Completed and blank Income and Expense Declaration filed showing service on Respondent by personal service on 12-14-11. 12-20-11 jmc |
|
December 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$395.00 was made on receipt FLCE171755. |
|
December 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration | |
December 05, 2011 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
December 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Summons Issued Yes _x__ No ___ sms-12-7-11 Event: Pet Disso Marr-no children |