Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In the Matter of Brian E. Robles
A 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case was filed by Robles, Brian Elijah, against Santibanes - Cordero, Lisa Marie, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 20, 2011
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Category
43 Unlimited - Other Petition (not specified)
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
2 months and 4 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 23-FEB-2012 by MMENDOZA. |
|
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Name change judgment filed Judgment granting change of name signed by Judge McGuire filed. New name Elijah Santibanes lp . |
|
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Name Change
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of publication filed Proof of publication of name change filed. First date of publication 12/28/11 lp . |
|
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge McGuire Minute Order from Dept.: 401 Clerk: M Mendoza Reporter: 9/18/36 Nature of Hearing: Order Show Cause Name Change Proof of Publication filed in open court. Motion is granted. Order signed lp |
|
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Event: New Civil Case Filed |
|
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Name Change OSC filed Order to show cause for change of name filed. Hearing set on 02-16-12 at 9:00 a.m. in Dept. #401. gs |
|
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Petition for name change filed Proposed new name: Elijah Santibanes gs |