Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Roberto Rivera-Santoyo vs Maria Orozco/DISMISS
A 22 Unlimited - Auto case was filed by Rivera-Santoyo, Roberto Fausto, against Orozco, Ramon, and Orozco, Maria Delcarmen, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge Simpson, Alan presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 06, 2011
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Category
22 Unlimited - Auto
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
2 months and 5 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
February 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed prejudice. Event: Dismissal filed. |
|
February 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Off calendar for CMC scheduled for 4-16-12 dismiss. sg | |
January 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$790.00 was made on receipt CVCE160409. |
|
January 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion First paper fee paid. ks Event: First paper fee, unltd civil |
|
January 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer unltd civil case filed Answer to Complaint filed. ks |
|
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
POS of Summons & comp personal Proof of service of Summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Maria Delcarmen Orozco on 12-11-11 . ks |
|
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Proof of service by mail filed. ks |
|
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
POS of Summons & comp - subst. Proof of service of Summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Maria Delacarmen Orozco , mailed on 12-12-11 . ks |
|
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
POS of Summons & comp personal Proof of service of Summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Carmen Orozco on 12-11-11 . ks |
|
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit filed Affidavit of reasonable diligence filed. ks |
|
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet ks | |
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion ks Event: Civil complaint filed |
|
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion ks Event: New Civil Case Filed |
|
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$395.00 was made on receipt CVCE159432. |
|
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Mgnt Conf Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 06-DEC-2011 by KSULLIVAN. |
|
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Summons filed Summons on Complaint filed. ks |