Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Cathy Crews vs Ramona Egan/DISM
A 06 Unlimited - Breach Of Contract/Warranty case was filed by Crews, Cathy, against Egan, Ramona, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge Black, Donald presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 17, 2011
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Category
06 Unlimited - Breach of Contract/Warranty
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Case Duration
1 year, 2 months and 27 days
Time To Trial
1 year, 3 months and 24 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 After Settlement | |
October 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Simpson, Alan |
|
October 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Simpson, Alan |
|
October 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Smith, Bruce |
|
October 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Off calendar for dismissal hearing scheduled for 12/17/12. Dismissal filed. dhouston | |
October 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed with prejudice. dhouston Event: Dismissal filed. |
|
September 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of CRC 225 Hrng Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 13-SEP-2012 by RLSMITH. |
|
September 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Off calendar for TRR scheduled for 10/5/12. Notice of Settlement filed. rls | |
September 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Judge, Pro Tempore |
|
September 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Conditional settlement reached and filed as to entire case . Projected completion date: 10/25/2012 csp | |
September 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Off calendar for CT scheduled for 10/10/12. Notice of Settlement filed. rls | |
September 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Stipulation re Settlement and Release filed (no order provided) lmi | |
October 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Off calendar for Jury Trial scheduled for 10/10/12. Set in error. dhouston | |
October 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conf Minutes Case set for trial: Court Trial set for 10/10/12 at 9:00 am in Department 503. Time estimate: 2 days Trial Readiness set for 10/5/12 at 9:30 am in Department 503. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 9/12/12 at 10:00 am in Room 575. dhouston |
|
October 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
October 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 21-OCT-2011 by DBRENGELMAN. |
|
October 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 21-OCT-2011 by DBRENGELMAN. |
|
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
ADR Stipulation - Mediation ADR stipulation filed - parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: John McDaniel Esp dhouston |
|
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conf Stmt Case Management Conference Statement filed. sg |
|
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conf Stmt Case Management Conference Statement filed. (gac) |
|
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Proof of service of case managment statement filed. Served on Susna M. Brown by mail on 10-7-11 . (gac) |
|
August 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Court Fees Waived $395.00 (Amount of fees waived for documents filed or services provided) Specify: Answer to Complaint lmi |
|
August 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order granting waiver of fees Order granting waiver of court fees and costs signed by Clerk filed. lmi |
|
August 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. lmi Event: App for waiver of court fees |
|
August 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer filed Answer to Complaint filed. lmi |
|
August 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed Proof of service of Answer filed. Served on Richard Harris by mail on 08/02/11. lmi |
|
July 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
POS of Summons & comp personal Proof of service of Summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Ramona Egan on 07-07-11. gs |
|
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$395.00 was made on receipt CVCE153886. |
|
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion TLC Event: Civil complaint filed |
|
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet TLC | |
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Summons filed Summons on Complaint filed. TLC |
|
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Mgnt Conf Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 17-JUN-2011 by TCOHAN. |
|
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Event: New Civil Case Filed |