Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Maria Rodriguez vs. Leslie Duangdara/Dismissed
A 22 Unlimited - Auto case was filed by Rodriguez, Raul, and Rodriguez, Maria, against Duangdara, Leslie, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge Simpson, Alan presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 02, 2011
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Category
22 Unlimited - Auto
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
9 months and 6 days
Time To Trial
1 year, 5 months and 4 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Simpson, Alan |
|
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Simpson, Alan |
|
October 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Judge, Pro Tempore |
|
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of entry of dismissal filed. dhouston | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Off calendar for MSC scheduled for 10-10-12. Dismissed gs | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed With prejudice. gs Event: Dismissal filed. |
|
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Off calendar for JT scheduled for 11-05-12. Dismissed gs | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Off calendar for TRR scheduled for 12-02-12. Dismissed gs | |
December 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of change of address Notice of change of firm name to be changed to Peel/Garcia, LLP effective immediately . (gac)) |
|
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Jury requested by both/all Jury requested by both plaintiff and defendant/all parties. db |
|
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conf Minutes Case set for trial: Jury Trial set for 11/5/12 at 9:00 a.m. in Dept 503 Time estimate: 5 days Trial Readiness set for 11/2/12 at 9:30 a.m. in Department 503 Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 10/10/12 at 1:30 in Room 575 db |
|
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 07-OCT-2011 by DBRENGELMAN. |
|
October 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Clerk Cert of Mailing Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 07-OCT-2011 by DBRENGELMAN. |
|
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
ADR Stipulation - Mediation ADR stipulation filed - parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: James Dilling dhouston |
|
July 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$395.00 was made on receipt CVCE154596. |
|
July 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer unltd civil case filed Answer to Complaint filed. gs |
|
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
POS of Summons & comp personal Proof of service of Summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Leslie Duangdara on 6/11/11 . TLC |
|
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Mgnt Conf Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 02-JUN-2011 by GCASTILLOGILSTRAP. |
|
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Event: New Civil Case Filed |
|
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$395.00 was made on receipt CVCE153232. |
|
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Summons filed Summons on Complaint filed. (gac) |
|
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion (gac) Event: Civil complaint filed |
|
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet (gac) |