Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Michael Guerra vs. Joye Browning
A 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case was filed by Guerra, Michael, against Browning, Joye, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. Judge McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 31, 2011
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Fresno County, CA
Category
43 Unlimited - Other Petition (not specified)
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Relief Denied
Case Duration
2 months and 11 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
TRO petition Denied Amended Temporary Restraining Order filed and Denied by Judge Alvarez lp . |
|
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Amended document filed Amended Request for orders to Stop Harassmetn filed. csp |
|
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Received for Signature Order: Request for Orders to Stop Harassment Forwarded to: Dept 401 csp |
|
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona |
|
July 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ of Mandate
Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 27-JUN-2011 by KMLATT. |
|
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order Judge McGuire Minute Order from Dept.: 401 Clerk: K Latt Reporter: 10/58/31 Nature of Hearing: Show Cause Regard Harassment The petition is DENIED for the reason that petitioner has failed to carry his burden of proving by clear and convincing evidence that he is entitled to the relief he has requested. This denial is without prejudice to the filing of a renewed petition based on facts which petitioner believes he can prove by clear and convincing evidence. lp |
|
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 23-JUN-2011 by KMLATT. |
|
June 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Regard Harassment
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
TRO petition Denied Temporary Restraining Order filed and Denied by Judge Gallagher Matter is set for OSC re Harassment on 6/23/11 at 9:30 am in D 401 lp |
|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cal Setting Printed Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 31-MAY-2011 by SAMGARCIA. |
|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Event: New Civil Case Filed |
|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | Off calendar for WRTM scheduled for 7-26-11 set in error, wrong case. sg | |
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Orders to Stop Harassment filed. (gac) |