Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DONEGAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS. E ELECTRIC, INC.
On December 19, 2018 a debt / breach of contract case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sussex County, DE. Judge STOKES, RICHARD F presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 19, 2018
Last Refreshed
August 31, 2022
Filing Location
Sussex County, DE
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Craig A. Karsnitz;Category
DEBT / BREACH OF CONTRACT
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Dismissal
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
FILE ARCHIVED - BC DATE DOCKETED: JULY 5, 2022 NOTICE |
|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 23, 2019 ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE Craig A\. Karsnitz ON 8-20-2019. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THIS CASE IS DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE. ACCEPTED BY: MAT TRANSACTION ID: 64121027 ORDER |
|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 23, 2019 ORDER SIGNED BY Craig A\. Karsnitz, JUDGE 8/20/19. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THIS CASE IS DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE. ACCEPTED BY: MAT TRANSACTION ID: 64121027 ORDER |
|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
CLOSED: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL DATE DOCKETED: AUGUST 17, 2019 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ACCEPTED BY: MAT TRANSACTION ID: 64102666 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO THE CROSSCLAIM DATE DOCKETED: JUNE 19, 2019 E ELECTRIC, INC.'S REPLY TO CROSS CLAIM FILED BY CO-DEFENDANT ATLANTIC REFRIGERATION AND AIR CONDITIONING, INC. IN CONJUNCTION WITH ITS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: KDM TRANSACTION ID: 63372623 ANSWER TO THE CROSSCLAIM |
|
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE RICHARD F. STOKES 3-21-2019 IT IS ORDERED THAT THIS ACTION IS STAYED PENDING THE CONCLUSION OF THE DEWSON ACTION CURRENTLY PENDING UNDER CIVIL ACTION NO. S17C-12-014 RFS. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IN THIS ACTION IS TO PROVIDE A STATUS REPORT TO THE COURT IN 180 DAYS AND ADVISE WHETHER THE PARTIES REQUIRE A CONTINUATION OF THE STAY. DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 22, 2019 ACCEPTED BY: KDM TRANSACTION ID: 63091083 ORDER |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT E ELECTRIC, INC.'S REPLY TO CROSS CLAIM OF ATLANTIC REFRIGERATION AND AIR CONDITIONING (STEPHEN F. DRYDEN) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 20, 2019 ACCEPTED BY: KDM TRANSACTION ID: 63079964 ANSWER TO THE CROSSCLAIM |
|
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 16, 2019 MICHAEL J. FOLLETT ESQUIRE ENTERS HIS APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR ATLANTIC REFRIGERATION AND AIR CONDITIONING, INC. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE CASE INFORMATION SHEET FOR DEFENDANT ATLANTIC REFRIGERATION AND AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ACCEPTED BY: KDM TRANSACTION ID: 63070969 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
|
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 19, 2019 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS ACCEPTED BY: KDM TRANSACTION ID: 63072441 STIPULATION |
|
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT ALTANTIC REFRIGERATION AND AIR CONDITIONING INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT WITH (1) CROSS CLAIMS DIRECTED TO ALL DEFENDANTS FOR INDEMNITY AND CONTRIBUTION (2) CROSS CLAIMS DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT AQUA TECH WATER SUPPLIES LLC FOR CONTRACTUAL AND COMMON LAW INDEMNIFICATION AND CONTRIBUTION AND (3) ANSWER TO ALL PAST, PRESENT AND FUTURE CROSS CLAIMS (MICHAEL J. FOLLETT) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE DATE DOCKETED: MARCH 16, 2019 ACCEPTED BY: KDM TRANSACTION ID: 63071579 ANSWER & CROSSCLAIM |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: FEBRUARY 5, 2019 STEPHEN F. DRYDEN, ESQUIRE ENTERS HIS APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT E ELECTRIC INC. ACCEPTED BY: MAT TRANSACTION ID: 62928069 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 31, 2019 SERVED E ELECTRIC INC BY SERVING ELAINE TWADDELL, WIFE OF THE OWNER ON 1-24-19 ACCEPTED BY: KDM TRANSACTION ID: 62904603 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED: DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 23, 2019 SERVED ATLANTIC REFRIGERATION AND AIR CONDITIONING INC BY SERVING SHELLY KAPTOR, ADMINISTRATIVE ASSISTANT ON 1-14-2019; SERVED AQUA TECH WATER SUPPLIES LLC BY SERVING LISA WHITE, AGENT'S SPOUSE ON 1-10-2019 ACCEPTED BY: KDM TRANSACTION ID: 62883494 WRIT RETURN (GENERIC) |
|
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 19, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF NICHOLAS SKILES ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT AQUA TECH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ACCEPTED BY: KDM TRANSACTION ID: 62877058 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FILED |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SENT TO SHERIFF FOR SERVICE OF COMPLAINT ON E ELECTRIC, INC. (NEW CASTLE) SUMMONS SENT TO SHERIFF FOR SERVICE OF COMPLAINT ON ATLANTIC REGRIGERATION AND AIR CONDITIONINC. ING. SUMMONS SENT TO SHERIFF FOR SERVICE FO COMPLAINT ON AQUA TECH WATER SUPPLIES, LLC DATE DOCKETED: JANUARY 8, 2019 SUMMONS SENT TO SHERIFF |
|
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
INITIAL FILING DEBT / BREACH OF CONTRACT DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 21, 2018 INIT FILING DEBT/BREACH CONT |
|
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
INITIAL COMPLAINT (LOUIS J. RIZZO. JR.) CASE INFORMATION STATEMENT PRAECIPE FOR DEF. E ELECTRIC, INC. PRAECIPE FOR DEF. ATLANTIC REFRIGERATION AND AIR CONDITIONING INC. PRAECIPE FOR DEF. AQUA TECH WATER SUPPLIES, INC. SUMMONS (NEW CASTLE) SUMMONS (SUSSEX) DATE DOCKETED: DECEMBER 21, 2018 ACCEPTED BY: KDM TRANSACTION ID: 62786007 INITIAL COMPLAINT |