Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CONDEMARIN AND VICTORIA
A Summary Dissolution case was filed by Condemarin, Aldo G, and Victoria, Lorena Nelly, in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 31, 2009
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
SUMMARY DISSOLUTION
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Dissolution
Case Duration
6 months and 9 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2010 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - SUMMARY 03/11/2010 | |
March 11, 2010 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - SUMMARY - REQUEST / JUDGMENT / NOTICE OF ENTRY 03/11/2010 09:54:00 # Pages:2 |
|
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE - CHANGE OF ADDRESS 02/10/2010 14:10:00 # Pages:2 |
|
August 31, 2009 | Docket Event | PETITION - SUMMARY DISSOLUTION 08/31/2009 10:49:00 # Pages:2 |
|
August 31, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE - RELATED CASE 08/31/2009 10:49:00 # Pages:4 |
|