Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
NGUYEN VS THOMAS
An Unlawful Detainer - Residential case was filed in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge John S. Adams presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 28, 2007
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Case Duration
4 years, 11 months and 14 days
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2012 | Docket Event | TRANSFER OF WEST JUSTICE CENTER CASE TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - ADMIN ORDER 12/7, EFFECTIVE 10/01/2012. | |
February 29, 2008 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY NGUYEN, MAI ON 02/29/2008 |
|
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED. |
|
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT FINDING. | |
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY NGUYEN, MAI ON 01/31/2008 |
|
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Application for Writ of Possession FILED BY NGUYEN, MAI ON 01/30/2008 |
|
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10043922 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 68335. |
|
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR ORANGE COUNTY. WRIT FORWARDED TO SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT WITH INSTRUCTIONS & CHECK. | |
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING MAILED. |
|
January 29, 2008 | Docket Event | POSSESSION OF THE FOLLOWING PROPERTY IS AWARDED TO PLAINTIFF: 10701 GARDEN GROVE BLVD.; GARDEN GROVE, CA 92843. | |
January 29, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER DATED 12/17/07 CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC. | |
January 29, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 12/17/2007 08:30:00 AM. |
|
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY NGUYEN, MAI ON 01/18/2008 |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | WRIT RETURNED. WRIT OF POSSESSION INCOMPLETE AS TO 24E. NO PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS AND JAMES THOMAS. NO Application for Writ of Possession. | |
December 20, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING | |
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event | COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/17/2007 AT 08:30:00 AM IN W01 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER. | |
November 28, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY NGUYEN, MAI ON 11/28/2007 |