Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CHASE BANK VS NGUYEN
A Rule 3.740 Collections case was filed by Chase Bank Usa N.A. A Corporation, against Vuong Nguyen, in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 17, 2007
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
RULE 3.740 COLLECTIONS
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
4 years, 11 months and 14 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2012 | Docket Event | TRANSFER OF WEST JUSTICE CENTER CASE TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - ADMIN ORDER 12/7, EFFECTIVE 10/01/2012. | |
May 14, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/14/2008 AT 13:30:00 IN WJC AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER | |
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHASE BANK USA NA ON 05/05/2008 |
|
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK. | |
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FILED BY CHASE BANK USA NA ON 01/16/2008 |
|
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: LOST ORIGINAL CONTRACT AND WAIVER OF EXCESS INTEREST) FILED BY CHASE BANK USA NA ON 01/14/2008 |
|
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CHASE BANK USA NA ON 01/14/2008 |
|
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES (DOES 1 TO 10, ONLY) FILED BY CHASE BANK USA NA ON 01/14/2008 |
|
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event | DRAP | |
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: CCP 1033) FILED BY CHASE BANK USA NA ON 01/14/2008 |
|
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CHASE BANK USA NA ON 01/14/2008 |
|
November 05, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE - SUBSTITUTED) WAS FILED BY CHASE BANK USA NA ON 11/05/2007 | |
October 18, 2007 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT - COLLECTION 3.740 (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED ON 10/18/2007 | |
October 18, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER (NTC OF OSC RE DISMISSAL AND/OR SANCTIONS & NTC SENT) WAS FILED ON 10/18/2007 | |
October 18, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED AND FILED (Summons ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 10/18/2007 | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 10/17/2007 |