Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CANDELARIA V CANDELARIA
A Domestic Violence case was filed in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge HENSON, CAROL L. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 29, 2007
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Domestic Violence
Case Duration
3 years and 21 days
Parties
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2010 | hearing | HEARING - MOTION - COURT'S | |
November 18, 2010 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - OFF CALENDAR 11/18/2010 13:30:00 # Pages:1 |
|
November 01, 2010 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - INVENTORY REASSIGNMENT 11/01/2010 12:01:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 19, 2010 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER 10/19/2010 15:42:00 # Pages:1 |
|
December 04, 2008 | Docket Event | OTHER 12/04/2008 14:44:00 BATTERERS INTERVENTION PROGRAM PROGRESS REPORT # Pages:1 |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event | MATTER VACATED 10/08/2008 09:07:00 PLEASE SEE MINUTE ORDER DATED 8-11-08.MB. | |
October 01, 2008 | hearing | REVIEW | |
August 11, 2008 | hearing | HEARING - MOTION - COURT'S | |
August 11, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - OFF CALENDAR 08/11/2008 08:30:00 # Pages:1 |
|
August 11, 2008 | Docket Event | REPORT - CONFIDENTIAL 08/11/2008 13:34:00 # Pages:1 | |
August 11, 2008 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - COMMISSIONER 08/11/2008 11:46:00 # Pages:1 |
|
July 14, 2008 | hearing | HEARING - MOTION - COURT'S | |
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUANCE 07/14/2008 08:30:00 # Pages:1 |
|
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - INVENTORY REASSIGNMENT 05/27/2008 12:01:00 # Pages:1 |
|
April 28, 2008 | hearing | REVIEW | |
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUED BY COURT 04/28/2008 13:30:00 # Pages:1 |
|
January 28, 2008 | hearing | REVIEW | |
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event | DV RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING 01/28/2008 10:41:00 1ST AMENDED # Pages:8 |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUED BY COURT 01/28/2008 13:30:00 # Pages:1 |
|
November 19, 2007 | hearing | HRG - RFO - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE | |
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER - ATTEND COUNSELING - PERSONAL EMPOWERMENT PROGRAM 11/19/2007 11:34:00 RECOMMENDATION # Pages:2 |
|
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER 11/19/2007 08:30:00 # Pages:2 |
|
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER - ATTEND BATTERER'S / DRUG / ALCOHOL PROGRAM 11/19/2007 11:35:00 # Pages:4 |
|
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - COMMISSIONER 11/19/2007 09:53:00 # Pages:1 |
|
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event | DV RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING 11/19/2007 08:28:00 # Pages:8 |
|
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE 11/19/2007 14:20:00 # Pages:1 |
|
November 14, 2007 | Docket Event | DV ANSWER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 11/14/2007 09:58:00 # Pages:3 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | DV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 10/29/2007 13:59:00 # Pages:11 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/29/2007 13:59:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - NOTICE - EX PARTE 10/29/2007 13:59:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | DV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 10/29/2007 13:58:00 # Pages:7 |
|