Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
WRIGHT V WRIGHT
A Domestic Violence case was filed in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge MILLARD, MARK S. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 29, 2007
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Domestic Violence
Case Duration
21 days
Parties
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2007 | hearing | HRG - RFO - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE | |
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 11/19/2007 09:23:00 # Pages:2 |
|
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER 11/19/2007 08:30:00 # Pages:1 |
|
November 07, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE 11/07/2007 11:31:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | DV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 10/29/2007 09:25:00 # Pages:5 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/29/2007 09:26:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | DV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 10/29/2007 09:26:00 # Pages:6 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - NOTICE - EX PARTE 10/29/2007 09:26:00 # Pages:1 |
|