Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CAPITAL ONE V CRUZ
A Rule 3.740 Collections case was filed in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 17, 2007
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
RULE 3.740 COLLECTIONS
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Case Duration
5 years, 8 months and 14 days
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013. | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL-FULL W/PREJUDICE) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 10/29/2007 | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT - COLLECTION 3.740 (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 10/17/2007 | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 10/17/2007 | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER (NTC OF OSC RE DISMISSAL AND/OR SANCTIONS & NTC SENT) WAS FILED ON 10/17/2007 | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED AND FILED (Summons ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 10/17/2007 |