Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CAPITAL V PAYNE
A Rule 3.740 Collections case was filed in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 17, 2007
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
RULE 3.740 COLLECTIONS
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
5 years, 8 months and 14 days
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013. | |
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 04/17/2008 |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/16/2008 AT 13:30:00 IN HLH AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS | |
April 10, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/20/2008 AT 01:30:00 PM IN S09 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS. |
|
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY Summons & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 03/26/2008 |
|
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 11/30/2007 | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT - COLLECTION 3.740 (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 10/17/2007 | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED AND FILED (Summons ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 10/17/2007 | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER (NTC OF OSC RE DISMISSAL AND/OR SANCTIONS & NTC SENT) WAS FILED ON 10/17/2007 | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 10/17/2007 |