Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
US BANK VS BELLA
A Rule 3.740 Collections case was filed by Us Bank National Association Nd, against Sharon Shepard, Personal Guarantor, and Bella Baskets Llc, A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge Karen L. Robinson presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 17, 2007
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
RULE 3.740 COLLECTIONS
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Transfer
Case Duration
5 years, 8 months and 14 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013. | |
May 24, 2013 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 321986 RECEIVED ON 05/24/2013 11:54:30 AM. | |
May 24, 2013 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ND ON 05/24/2013 |
|
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010. |
|
March 05, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - Abstract of Judgment IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10324048 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10147923. |
|
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED. | |
January 30, 2009 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ND ON 01/30/2009 |
|
January 30, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT. | |
January 28, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ND ON 01/28/2009 |
|
January 28, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ND ON 01/28/2009 |
|
January 28, 2009 | Docket Event | DRAP - COURT JUDGMENT | |
January 28, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ND ON 01/28/2009 |
|
January 28, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - OTHER (COPIES; ORDER) FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ND ON 01/28/2009 |
|
January 28, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - OTHER (INTEREST) FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ND ON 01/28/2009 |
|
December 22, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons (AMENDED) FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ND ON 12/22/2008 |
|
November 20, 2008 | Docket Event | REJECT - COURT JUDGMENT |
|
November 06, 2008 | Docket Event | DRAP - COURT JUDGMENT | |
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event | REJECT - COURT JUDGMENT |
|
October 07, 2008 | Docket Event | DRAP - COURT JUDGMENT | |
September 29, 2008 | Docket Event | REJECT - COURT JUDGMENT |
|
September 23, 2008 | Docket Event | DRAP - COURT JUDGMENT | |
April 21, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/15/2008 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H12 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH. | |
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/14/2008 AT 13:30:00 IN HNB AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH | |
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/17/2008 AT 01:30:00 PM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH. | |
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY Summons & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ND ON 12/03/2007 | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ND ON 10/29/2007 | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF OSC) WAS FILED ON 10/17/2007 | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 10/17/2007 | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT - COLLECTION 3.740 (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ND ON 10/17/2007 | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED AND FILED (Summons ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 10/17/2007 |