Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CO OF ORG V CASTANEDA
A Paternity - Department Of Chil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 29, 2007
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
PATERNITY - DEPARTMENT OF CHIL
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Paternity
Case Duration
3 months and 8 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - STIPULATED 02/05/2008 | |
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - STIPULATION 02/05/2008 14:39:00 # Pages:5 |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - Summons 02/05/2008 14:39:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons & COMPLAINT - PARENTAL OBLIGATION 10/29/2007 09:47:00 # Pages:13 |
|