Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CO OF ORG V MONTANO
A Paternity - Department Of Chil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 29, 2007
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
PATERNITY - DEPARTMENT OF CHIL
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Paternity
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
3 months and 16 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2008 | hearing | HEARING - MOTION - JUDGMENT | |
February 14, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTES & ORDER / JUDGMENT 02/14/2008 13:30:00 # Pages:9 |
|
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE - PRODUCE AND APPEAR 01/16/2008 10:24:00 # Pages:1 |
|
January 16, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION - JUDGMENT 01/16/2008 10:23:00 # Pages:3 |
|
November 21, 2007 | Docket Event | ANSWER - COMPLAINT 11/21/2007 07:54:00 # Pages:2 |
|
November 21, 2007 | Docket Event | INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 11/21/2007 07:55:00 # Pages:4 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons & COMPLAINT - PARENTAL OBLIGATION 10/29/2007 09:40:00 # Pages:10 |
|