Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CO OF ORG V TORRES
A Paternity - Department Of Chil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 29, 2007
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
PATERNITY - DEPARTMENT OF CHIL
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Paternity
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
12 years, 3 months and 4 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 01/29/2020 |
|
July 02, 2015 | hearing | HEARING - MOTION - MODIFICATION | |
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event | GUIDELINE CALCULATION RESULTS SUMMARY 07/02/2015 09:36:00 # Pages:3 |
|
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event | MINUTES & ORDER / JUDGMENT 07/02/2015 08:00:00 # Pages:11 |
|
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL (GOVERNMENTAL) 05/08/2015 13:24:00 # Pages:2 |
|
May 05, 2015 | hearing | HEARING - MOTION - MODIFICATION | |
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUANCE 05/05/2015 08:00:00 # Pages:1 |
|
March 18, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL (GOVERNMENTAL) 03/18/2015 09:12:00 # Pages:2 |
|
March 16, 2015 | hearing | HEARING - MOTION - MODIFICATION | |
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUANCE 03/16/2015 08:00:00 # Pages:1 |
|
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL (GOVERNMENTAL) 01/21/2015 11:07:00 # Pages:2 |
|
January 15, 2015 | hearing | HEARING - MOTION - MODIFICATION | |
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event | INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 01/15/2015 15:31:00 # Pages:4 |
|
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUANCE 01/15/2015 13:30:00 # Pages:1 |
|
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION - MODIFICATION 12/12/2014 13:27:00 # Pages:8 |
|
October 11, 2012 | hearing | HEARING - MOTION - MODIFICATION | |
October 11, 2012 | Docket Event | MINUTES & ORDER / JUDGMENT 10/11/2012 13:30:00 # Pages:9 |
|
July 23, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION - MODIFICATION 07/23/2012 11:59:00 # Pages:7 |
|
March 14, 2012 | hearing | HEARING - MOTION - MODIFICATION | |
February 21, 2012 | hearing | HEARING - RFO - MODIFICATION CUSTODY / VISITATION / SUPPORT | |
February 21, 2012 | hearing | HEARING - MOTION - MODIFICATION | |
February 21, 2012 | Docket Event | GUIDELINE CALCULATION RESULTS SUMMARY 02/21/2012 14:47:00 # Pages:3 |
|
February 21, 2012 | Docket Event | MATTER VACATED 02/21/2012 09:29:00 ADVANCED TO 02/21/12. DSF | |
February 21, 2012 | Docket Event | MINUTES & ORDER / JUDGMENT 02/21/2012 08:00:00 # Pages:12 |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event | RESPONSIVE DECLARATION - REQUEST FOR ORDER 01/31/2012 11:21:00 # Pages:2 |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 01/31/2012 11:21:00 # Pages:1 |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 01/31/2012 11:22:00 # Pages:1 |
|
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 01/25/2012 13:02:00 # Pages:1 |
|
January 20, 2012 | hearing | HEARING - MOTION - REVIEW LICENSE DENIAL | |
January 20, 2012 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - OFF CALENDAR 01/20/2012 08:15:00 # Pages:1 |
|
January 19, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 01/19/2012 13:34:00 # Pages:1 |
|
January 19, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 01/19/2012 13:35:00 # Pages:1 |
|
January 19, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 01/19/2012 13:35:00 # Pages:1 |
|
January 19, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 01/19/2012 13:34:00 # Pages:1 |
|
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event | RESPONSIVE DECLARATION - REQUEST FOR ORDER 01/11/2012 10:49:00 # Pages:4 |
|
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 01/11/2012 10:50:00 # Pages:1 |
|
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 01/11/2012 15:59:00 # Pages:1 |
|
January 04, 2012 | Docket Event | INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 01/04/2012 08:38:00 # Pages:4 |
|
January 04, 2012 | Docket Event | RFO - MODIFICATION 01/04/2012 08:37:00 # Pages:4 |
|
January 04, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION - JUDICIAL REVIEW - LICENSE DENIAL 01/04/2012 08:39:00 # Pages:3 |
|
January 04, 2012 | Docket Event | INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 01/04/2012 13:49:00 # Pages:4 |
|
January 04, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION - MODIFICATION 01/04/2012 13:49:00 # Pages:7 |
|
November 14, 2011 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - PARENTAL OBLIGATION 11/14/2011 08:44:00 2ND SUPPLEMENTAL # Pages:9 |
|
November 14, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - DUE DILIGENCE 11/14/2011 08:43:00 # Pages:1 |
|
November 14, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - DUE DILIGENCE 11/14/2011 08:44:00 OF MAILING # Pages:1 |
|
November 14, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT - GOVT 11/14/2011 08:43:00 # Pages:1 |
|
November 14, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - Summons 11/14/2011 08:43:00 # Pages:2 |
|
August 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Summons & SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT - PARENTAL OBLIGATION 08/22/2011 00:00:00 # Pages:14 |
|
March 25, 2010 | hearing | HEARING - MOTION - MODIFICATION | |
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - OFF CALENDAR 03/25/2010 13:30:00 # Pages:1 |
|
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event | STIPULATION & ORDER (GOVERNMENTAL) 03/25/2010 11:47:00 # Pages:11 |
|
February 18, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION - MODIFICATION 02/18/2010 10:30:00 # Pages:4 |
|
February 18, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE - PRODUCE AND APPEAR 02/18/2010 10:30:00 # Pages:2 |
|
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - Summons 12/02/2009 14:31:00 # Pages:2 |
|
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT - GOVT 12/02/2009 14:29:00 # Pages:1 |
|
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - DEFAULT 12/02/2009 | |
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - PARENTAL OBLIGATION 12/02/2009 14:31:00 (1ST SUPPLEMENTAL) # Pages:7 |
|
August 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Summons & SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT - PARENTAL OBLIGATION 08/20/2009 00:00:00 1ST # Pages:13 |
|
August 20, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - DEFAULT 08/20/2008 | |
August 20, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - Summons 08/20/2008 11:53:00 # Pages:2 |
|
August 20, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - PARENTAL OBLIGATION 08/20/2008 11:55:00 # Pages:7 |
|
August 20, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT - GOVT 08/20/2008 11:53:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons & COMPLAINT - PARENTAL OBLIGATION 10/29/2007 08:17:00 # Pages:10 |
|