Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CO OF ORG V PALOVIK
A Paternity - Department Of Chil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 29, 2007
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
PATERNITY - DEPARTMENT OF CHIL
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Paternity
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
8 years, 7 months and 10 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION & ORDER (GOVERNMENTAL) 06/06/2016 |
|
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event | INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 05/13/2016 |
|
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION & ORDER (GOVERNMENTAL) 09/23/2014 15:36:00 # Pages:10 |
|
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION & ORDER (GOVERNMENTAL) 04/22/2014 09:07:00 # Pages:9 |
|
August 13, 2013 | hearing | HEARING - MOTION - MODIFICATION | |
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event | MINUTES & ORDER / JUDGMENT 08/13/2013 13:30:00 # Pages:12 |
|
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event | GUIDELINE CALCULATION RESULTS SUMMARY 08/13/2013 11:28:00 # Pages:3 |
|
August 06, 2013 | Docket Event | INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 08/06/2013 16:37:00 # Pages:4 |
|
August 05, 2013 | Docket Event | INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 08/05/2013 11:13:00 # Pages:4 |
|
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION - MODIFICATION 06/07/2013 14:22:00 # Pages:7 |
|
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 06/07/2013 14:22:00 # Pages:1 |
|
May 14, 2012 | Docket Event | INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 05/14/2012 10:10:00 # Pages:5 |
|
May 14, 2012 | Docket Event | STIPULATION & ORDER (GOVERNMENTAL) 05/14/2012 10:09:00 # Pages:12 |
|
May 14, 2012 | Docket Event | INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 05/14/2012 10:10:00 # Pages:8 |
|
June 22, 2011 | hearing | HEARING - MOTION - MODIFICATION | |
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event | MINUTES & ORDER / JUDGMENT 06/22/2011 13:30:00 # Pages:12 |
|
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event | GUIDELINE CALCULATION RESULTS SUMMARY 06/22/2011 13:41:00 GUIDELINE # Pages:3 |
|
May 17, 2011 | Docket Event | MOTION - MODIFICATION 05/17/2011 09:22:00 # Pages:7 |
|
November 17, 2009 | hearing | HEARING - MOTION - MODIFICATION | |
November 17, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES & ORDER / JUDGMENT 11/17/2009 13:30:00 # Pages:12 |
|
November 17, 2009 | Docket Event | GUIDELINE CALCULATION RESULTS SUMMARY 11/17/2009 13:59:00 # Pages:3 |
|
September 09, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION - MODIFICATION 09/09/2009 11:36:00 # Pages:4 |
|
September 09, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE - PRODUCE AND APPEAR 09/09/2009 11:37:00 # Pages:2 |
|
June 10, 2008 | hearing | HEARING - MOTION - JUDGMENT | |
June 10, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTES & ORDER / JUDGMENT 06/10/2008 13:30:00 # Pages:9 |
|
June 10, 2008 | Docket Event | REPORT - DNA ANALYSIS 06/10/2008 13:32:00 # Pages:4 | |
June 10, 2008 | Docket Event | SUPPORT CALCULATION PRINTOUT 06/10/2008 09:02:00 # Pages:1 |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE - PRODUCE AND APPEAR 04/16/2008 12:30:00 # Pages:2 |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION - JUDGMENT 04/16/2008 12:28:00 # Pages:4 |
|
February 25, 2008 | Docket Event | ANSWER - COMPLAINT 02/25/2008 09:34:00 # Pages:2 |
|
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event | ANSWER - COMPLAINT 11/27/2007 14:40:00 # Pages:2 |
|
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event | INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 11/27/2007 14:41:00 # Pages:27 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons & COMPLAINT - PARENTAL OBLIGATION 10/29/2007 07:42:00 # Pages:13 |
|