Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CO OF LOS ANGELES V MALDONADO
A Registration - Ca Support case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 29, 2007
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
REGISTRATION - CA SUPPORT
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Child Support
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
3 years, 10 months and 1 day
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2011 | hearing | HEARING - WAGE & EARNING ASSIGNMENT | |
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event | MINUTES & ORDER / JUDGMENT 08/30/2011 08:00:00 # Pages:8 |
|
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event | HEARING - WAGE & EARNING ASSIGNMENT | |
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 08/29/2011 15:51:00 # Pages:1 |
|
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 08/29/2011 08:18:00 # Pages:1 |
|
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 08/29/2011 08:17:00 # Pages:1 |
|
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event | RESPONSIVE DECLARATION - REQUEST FOR ORDER 08/29/2011 08:17:00 # Pages:4 |
|
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event | INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 08/23/2011 14:26:00 # Pages:5 |
|
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST - HEARING ON EARNING ASSIGNMENT 08/23/2011 14:26:00 # Pages:4 |
|
July 12, 2010 | Docket Event | REVIEW - COMMISSIONER'S FINDINGS & RECOMMENDATIONS 07/12/2010 13:59:00 # Pages:2 |
|
July 08, 2010 | Docket Event | INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 07/08/2010 15:51:00 # Pages:6 |
|
July 08, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER 07/08/2010 16:13:00 RECOMMENDED ORDER ON SUBMITTED MATTER # Pages:9 |
|
July 08, 2010 | Docket Event | RESPONSIVE DECLARATION - REQUEST FOR ORDER 07/08/2010 15:51:00 # Pages:2 |
|
July 08, 2010 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - OTHER 07/08/2010 15:51:00 # Pages:2 |
|
June 08, 2010 | hearing | HEARING - MOTION - MODIFICATION | |
June 08, 2010 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER 06/08/2010 10:30:00 # Pages:2 |
|
June 08, 2010 | Docket Event | FINDINGS & RECOMMENDATION - COMMISSIONER 06/08/2010 11:19:00 # Pages:11 |
|
June 08, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 06/08/2010 11:19:00 # Pages:1 |
|
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 05/07/2010 07:52:00 # Pages:1 |
|
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION - MODIFICATION 05/07/2010 11:17:00 TELEPHONIC # Pages:4 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE - PAYMENT OF SUPPORT 10/29/2007 12:18:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER AFTER HEARING (GOVERNMENTAL) 10/29/2007 12:19:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE - REGISTRATION OF CALIF SUPPORT ORDER 10/29/2007 12:18:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | REGISTRATION - JUDGMENT - ORDER 10/29/2007 |