Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ASHWORTH V SCOTT
A Registration - Out Of State Su case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 29, 2007
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
REGISTRATION - OUT OF STATE SU
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Child Support
Status
Foreign,Sister-State Judgment
Case Duration
6 years, 5 months and 18 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event | REPORT - REGISTRATION 04/16/2014 16:24:00 1ST AMENDED # Pages:2 |
|
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event | REPORT - ACCOUNTING 04/16/2014 16:25:00 # Pages:35 |
|
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER 04/16/2014 16:24:00 # Pages:19 |
|
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE - REGISTRATION OF OUT-OF-STATE SUPPORT ORDER 04/16/2014 16:23:00 1ST AMENDED # Pages:1 |
|
October 04, 2013 | hearing | HEARING - OSC - CONTEMPT | |
October 04, 2013 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER 10/04/2013 08:00:00 # Pages:1 |
|
August 14, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONTEMPT 08/14/2013 11:32:00 # Pages:9 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT 10/29/2007 10:54:00 OF ARREARS # Pages:20 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | OTHER 10/29/2007 10:52:00 REGIS. STMT # Pages:1 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | REGISTRATION - OUT-OF-STATE CUSTODY ORDER 10/29/2007 10:51:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER 10/29/2007 10:53:00 # Pages:5 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER 10/29/2007 10:52:00 JOURNAL ENTRY # Pages:3 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE - PAYMENT OF SUPPORT 10/29/2007 10:51:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | REGISTRATION - JUDGMENT - ORDER 10/29/2007 |