Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CO OF STAISLAUS V SUMERI
A Registration - Ca Support case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 29, 2007
Last Refreshed
September 12, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
REGISTRATION - CA SUPPORT
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Child Support
Case Duration
6 years, 10 months and 8 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE - REGISTRATION OF CALIF SUPPORT ORDER 09/05/2014 12:01:00 # Pages:1 |
|
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | STATEMENT - REGISTRATION OF CALIF SUPPORT ORDER (GOVT) 09/05/2014 12:01:00 # Pages:9 |
|
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | STATEMENT - REGISTRATION OF CALIF SUPPORT ORDER 09/05/2014 12:01:00 # Pages:9 |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 03/14/2011 10:17:00 # Pages:1 |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE - PAYMENT OF SUPPORT (GOVT) 03/14/2011 10:17:00 # Pages:2 |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE - PAYMENT OF SUPPORT 03/14/2011 10:17:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE - REGISTRATION OF CALIF SUPPORT ORDER 10/29/2007 10:30:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - PARENTAL OBLIGATION 10/29/2007 10:31:00 # Pages:7 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE - PAYMENT OF SUPPORT (GOVT) 10/29/2007 10:30:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | REGISTRATION - JUDGMENT - ORDER 10/29/2007 | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE - PAYMENT OF SUPPORT 10/29/2007 10:30:00 # Pages:2 |
|