Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MARTINEZ V MARTINEZ
A Dissolution With Child case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge FLYNN, JOHN L., TRD presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 15, 2007
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
DISSOLUTION WITH CHILD
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
1 year, 4 months and 24 days
Time To Trial
7 months and 6 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 03/23/2009 08:37:00 # Pages:1 |
|
March 23, 2009 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT 03/23/2009 08:38:00 # Pages:10 |
|
March 23, 2009 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - STATUS ONLY 03/23/2009 08:38:00 | |
March 23, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 03/23/2009 08:37:00 # Pages:2 |
|
March 20, 2009 | hearing | HEARING - MOTION - BIFURCATION | |
March 20, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER 03/20/2009 08:45:00 # Pages:1 |
|
March 05, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE - CONTINUANCE 03/05/2009 13:58:00 # Pages:2 |
|
March 05, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE 03/05/2009 16:52:00 # Pages:2 |
|
February 27, 2009 | hearing | HEARING - MOTION - BIFURCATION | |
February 27, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUANCE 02/27/2009 08:45:00 # Pages:1 |
|
January 28, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 01/28/2009 13:44:00 # Pages:2 |
|
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE 01/13/2009 16:06:00 # Pages:2 |
|
December 18, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION - BIFURCATION 12/18/2008 12:07:00 # Pages:10 |
|
December 18, 2008 | Docket Event | PLEADING JOINDER - EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN 12/18/2008 16:13:00 # Pages:1 |
|
December 18, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST - JOINDER EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN & ORDER 12/18/2008 16:13:00 # Pages:2 |
|
June 04, 2008 | hearing | TRIAL | |
June 04, 2008 | Docket Event | STIPULATION & ORDER - REQUEST FOR ORDER 06/04/2008 15:47:00 # Pages:3 |
|
June 04, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER 06/04/2008 13:30:00 # Pages:2 |
|
April 10, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE 04/10/2008 16:20:00 # Pages:3 |
|
April 07, 2008 | hearing | HRG - RFO - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE | |
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER 04/07/2008 08:45:00 # Pages:1 |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - SUPPORT - MOTION TO DISQUALIFY - UNDECIDED 04/07/2008 13:49:00 # Pages:1 |
|
March 17, 2008 | hearing | HRG - RFO - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE | |
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event | DV REQUEST - CONTINUE COURT HEARING & ISSUE TRO 03/17/2008 08:39:00 # Pages:1 |
|
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUED BY STIPULATION 03/17/2008 08:45:00 # Pages:1 |
|
March 10, 2008 | hearing | HRG - RFO - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE | |
March 10, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUED BY STIPULATION 03/10/2008 08:45:00 # Pages:1 |
|
March 10, 2008 | Docket Event | DV REQUEST - CONTINUE COURT HEARING & ISSUE TRO 03/10/2008 08:37:00 # Pages:1 |
|
February 29, 2008 | Docket Event | REPORT - CONFIDENTIAL 02/29/2008 08:38:00 # Pages:29 | |
February 29, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST - OTHER 02/29/2008 08:38:00 REIMB REQ FOR CCI # Pages:1 |
|
December 19, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE - UNDOCUMENTED ACTION 12/19/2007 14:25:00 # Pages:1 |
|
December 04, 2007 | hearing | HRG - RFO - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE | |
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event | STIPULATION & ORDER - REQUEST FOR ORDER 12/04/2007 14:22:00 # Pages:2 |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUED BY COURT 12/04/2007 08:45:00 # Pages:1 |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event | STIPULATION & ORDER 12/04/2007 14:18:00 # Pages:1 |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event | DV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 12/04/2007 08:53:00 AMENDED # Pages:10 |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 12/04/2007 14:21:00 # Pages:2 |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event | DV ANSWER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 12/04/2007 14:26:00 # Pages:18 |
|
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 11/27/2007 09:15:00 # Pages:4 |
|
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event | RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 11/27/2007 09:14:00 # Pages:3 |
|
November 05, 2007 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 11/05/2007 14:23:00 # Pages:2 |
|
November 05, 2007 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER 11/05/2007 14:32:00 # Pages:1 |
|
November 05, 2007 | Docket Event | STIPULATION & ORDER - REQUEST FOR ORDER 11/05/2007 12:28:00 # Pages:2 |
|
November 05, 2007 | Docket Event | DV REQUEST - CONTINUE COURT HEARING & ISSUE TRO 11/05/2007 12:03:00 # Pages:1 |
|
November 05, 2007 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - REASSIGNMENT 11/05/2007 14:19:00 # Pages:1 |
|
November 05, 2007 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER 11/05/2007 08:30:00 | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 10/29/2007 15:54:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 10/29/2007 15:54:00 # Pages:2 | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/29/2007 15:53:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 10/29/2007 15:53:00 # Pages:17 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons 10/29/2007 15:53:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/29/2007 15:52:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 15, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER - ATTEND MEDIATION APPOINTMENT 10/15/2007 09:48:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 15, 2007 | Docket Event | DV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 10/15/2007 11:26:00 # Pages:8 |
|
October 15, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER - ATTEND MEDIATION APPOINTMENT 10/15/2007 11:31:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 15, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/15/2007 11:28:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 15, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER - ATTEND MEDIATION APPOINTMENT 10/15/2007 11:32:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 15, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - NOTICE - EX PARTE 10/15/2007 11:28:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 15, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - TRANSLATOR - ORAL 10/15/2007 11:28:00 # Pages:7 |
|
October 15, 2007 | Docket Event | DV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 10/15/2007 11:27:00 # Pages:6 |
|
October 15, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER - ATTEND MEDIATION APPOINTMENT 10/15/2007 11:28:00 # Pages:1 |
|