Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BUTTEL V BUTTEL
A Dissolution With Child case was filed by Buttel, Amber Nicole, against Buttel, Antonio Frank, in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 29, 2007
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
DISSOLUTION WITH CHILD
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
3 years, 3 months and 0 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2011 | hearing | HEARING - NOTICE - DISMISS - NO SERVICE | |
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL 01/28/2011 | |
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER 01/28/2011 08:00:00 # Pages:1 |
|
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE - DISMISS NO PROOF OF SERVICE 01/05/2011 17:17:00 GENERATED BY NOTICE TO DISMISS # Pages:1 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/29/2007 13:59:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 10/29/2007 14:00:00 # Pages:2 | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons 10/29/2007 13:55:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 10/29/2007 14:00:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 10/29/2007 13:57:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 10/29/2007 13:58:00 # Pages:4 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/29/2007 13:55:00 # Pages:2 |
|