Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ARAGONEZ V ARAGONEZ
A Dissolution With Child case was filed by Aragonez, Jennifer L, against Aragonez, Michael R, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge PALAFOX, JULIE A. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 29, 2007
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
DISSOLUTION WITH CHILD
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
2 years and 6 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE - CHANGE OF ADDRESS 11/03/2009 13:51:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 16, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 10/16/2009 16:01:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 16, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - Summons 10/16/2009 16:02:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 16, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 10/16/2009 16:02:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 16, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 10/16/2009 16:02:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 16, 2009 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE, STIPULATION & WAIVERS (Conversion) 10/16/2009 15:25:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 16, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/16/2009 16:02:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 16, 2009 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT 10/16/2009 16:00:00 # Pages:20 |
|
October 16, 2009 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 10/16/2009 | |
October 16, 2009 | Docket Event | WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/16/2009 16:02:00 # Pages:1 |
|
July 26, 2008 | hearing | CONFERENCE - STATUS | |
June 25, 2008 | hearing | CONFERENCE - STATUS | |
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - OFF CALENDAR 06/25/2008 08:30:00 # Pages:1 |
|
June 06, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE - STATUS CONFERENCE 06/06/2008 11:05:00 # Pages:1 |
|
June 03, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE - STATUS CONFERENCE 06/03/2008 12:03:00 GENERATED BY 90 DAY CONF NOTICE # Pages:1 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 10/29/2007 11:45:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons 10/29/2007 11:45:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/29/2007 11:44:00 # Pages:2 |
|