Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
VAN V SREY
A Dissolution Without Child case was filed by Van, Thavrag, against Srey, Chanmony, in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 29, 2007
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILD
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
6 months and 21 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2008 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL 05/20/2008 11:05:00 # Pages:2 |
|
May 20, 2008 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL 05/20/2008 11:05:00 # Pages:4 |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 05/01/2008 16:24:00 # Pages:2 |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 05/01/2008 16:16:00 # Pages:2 |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - Summons 05/01/2008 16:24:00 # Pages:2 |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT 05/01/2008 16:15:00 # Pages:2 |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 05/01/2008 | |
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/01/2008 16:17:00 # Pages:1 |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 05/01/2008 16:16:00 # Pages:2 | |
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 05/01/2008 16:15:00 # Pages:1 |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 05/01/2008 16:16:00 # Pages:2 |
|
March 07, 2008 | hearing | CONFERENCE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE | |
March 07, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - OFF CALENDAR 03/07/2008 08:00:00 # Pages:1 |
|
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE 02/11/2008 08:38:00 GENERATED BY 120 DAY PRODEDURAL CONF NOTICE # Pages:1 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 10/29/2007 11:59:00 # Pages:2 | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 10/29/2007 11:59:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons 10/29/2007 11:58:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/29/2007 11:58:00 # Pages:2 |
|