Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
AVILES V AVILES
A Dissolution Without Child case was filed by Aviles, Mary, against Aviles, Jaime, in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 29, 2007
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILD
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
11 months and 18 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2008 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 10/16/2008 16:06:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 14, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 10/14/2008 15:37:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 10, 2008 | hearing | HRG - DEFAULT | |
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 10/10/2008 15:36:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/10/2008 15:36:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER 10/10/2008 08:15:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - TEMPORARY JUDGE 10/10/2008 11:07:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event | WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/10/2008 15:37:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - DEFAULT 10/10/2008 | |
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT 10/10/2008 12:06:00 # Pages:17 |
|
August 05, 2008 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM - SET HEARING 08/05/2008 10:42:00 # Pages:1 |
|
July 23, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE - CHANGE OF ADDRESS 07/23/2008 10:44:00 # Pages:2 |
|
July 02, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/02/2008 09:03:00 # Pages:1 |
|
June 20, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 06/20/2008 10:16:00 # Pages:2 |
|
December 24, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - Summons 12/24/2007 15:55:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons 10/29/2007 09:37:00 # Pages:2 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/29/2007 09:37:00 # Pages:1 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/29/2007 09:37:00 # Pages:2 |
|