Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SATELLITE VS CHARLES
An Unlawful Detainer - Residential case was filed by Satellite Management Company, against Stewart Charles, Sr, and Charles Stewart, Sr, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge Renee E. Wilson presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 16, 2007
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Case Duration
3 years, 3 months and 20 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY SATELLITE MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 02/04/2011 |
|
March 23, 2009 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL - COPY OF ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION |
|
March 17, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT 03/05/2009 02:00:00 PM. |
|
March 05, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (WAGE GARNISHMENT) FILED BY SATELLITE MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 03/05/2009 |
|
February 11, 2009 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE - MEMO FROM LEVYING OFFICER |
|
February 11, 2009 | Docket Event | CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (WAGE GARNISHMENT) FILED BY CHARLES, JR., STEWART ON 02/11/2009 |
|
February 10, 2009 | Docket Event | CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT SCHEDULED FOR 03/05/2009 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C64 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
February 09, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10306044 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10129919. |
|
February 06, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY SATELLITE MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 02/06/2009 |
|
February 06, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY SATELLITE MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 02/06/2009 |
|
February 06, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (WAGE GARNISHMENT) FILED BY SATELLITE MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 02/06/2009 |
|
December 08, 2008 | Docket Event | WRIT ISSUED. | |
December 08, 2008 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10261499 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10085374. |
|
November 24, 2008 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY SATELLITE MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 11/24/2008 |
|
November 24, 2008 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY SATELLITE MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 11/24/2008 |
|
December 12, 2007 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY SATELLITE MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 12/12/2007 | |
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event | WRIT ISSUED. | |
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Application for Writ of Possession (COUNTY OF ORANGE) FILED BY SATELLITE MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 11/30/2007 | |
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10010317 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 34770. | |
November 29, 2007 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (BY COURT) FILED BY SATELLITE MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 11/29/2007 | |
November 17, 2007 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/16/2007 08:30:00 AM. | |
November 17, 2007 | Docket Event | POSSESSION OF THE FOLLOWING PROPERTY IS AWARDED TO SATELLITE MANAGEMENT COMPANY: 1081 EL CAMINO ROAD, APARTMENT 12, TUSTIN, CALIFORNIA 92780 | |
November 16, 2007 | Docket Event | COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/16/2007 AT 08:30:00 IN CJC AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER |