Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CAPITAL ONE VS MARICELLI
A Rule 3.740 Collections case was filed by Capital One Bank, against Tricia A Maricelli, in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 17, 2007
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
RULE 3.740 COLLECTIONS
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
5 months and 22 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT |
|
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/01/2008 AT 08:30:00 IN CJC AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER | |
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 01/25/2008 |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 12/31/2007 | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 12/31/2007 | |
November 26, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY Summons & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 11/26/2007 | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF OSC) WAS FILED ON 10/17/2007 | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT - COLLECTION 3.740 (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK ON 10/17/2007 | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 10/17/2007 | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED AND FILED (Summons ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 10/17/2007 |