Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CMRE FINANCIAL VS ARTINIAN
A Rule 3.740 Collections case was filed by Cmre Financial Services Inc, against Henry S Artinian, and Danielle E Artinian, in the jurisdiction of Orange County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 17, 2007
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
RULE 3.740 COLLECTIONS
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Stayed
Case Duration
11 years, 7 months and 26 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC ON 06/11/2019 |
|
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 1632619 RECEIVED ON 06/11/2019 12:36:07 PM. | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4819722 RECEIVED ON 02/27/2018 03:11:52 PM. | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS - CASE FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC ON 02/27/2018 |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC ON 02/27/2018 |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 3604575 RECEIVED ON 11/03/2017 03:33:39 PM. | |
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment (ISSUED ON 11/03/2017) RECEIVED ON 11/03/2017. |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - Abstract of Judgment IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12248076 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12071812. |
|
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1435512 REJECTED. |
|
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC ON 09/29/2017 |
|
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 3592335 RECEIVED ON 09/29/2017 09:52:28 AM. | |
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4512548 REJECTED. |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11926984 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751209. |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509410 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 09:17:54 AM. | |
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC ON 02/26/2016 |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC ON 02/26/2016 |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Application for and Renewal of Judgment FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC ON 02/26/2016 |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 2/26/16) RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016. |
|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC ON 04/16/2015 |
|
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 2361383 RECEIVED ON 08/20/2014 11:53:15 AM. | |
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC ON 08/20/2014 |
|
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11552877 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11376785. |
|
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 4150912 RECEIVED ON 02/25/2014 07:26:01 AM. | |
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC ON 02/25/2014 |
|
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event | WRIT (ISSUED 3/3/14) RECEIVED ON 02/25/2014. |
|
July 29, 2008 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED. | |
July 29, 2008 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - Abstract of Judgment IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10168607 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 192973. |
|
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/01/2008 AT 08:30:00 IN CJC AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER | |
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION RE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC ON 03/14/2008 |
|
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC ON 03/14/2008 |
|
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC ON 03/14/2008 |
|
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK. | |
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC ON 03/14/2008 |
|
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY Summons & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC ON 01/31/2008 |
|
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY Summons & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC ON 01/31/2008 |
|
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED ON 10/17/2007 | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF OSC) WAS FILED ON 10/17/2007 | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 10/17/2007 | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED AND FILED (Summons ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 10/17/2007 | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT - COLLECTION 3.740 (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC ON 10/17/2007 |