Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MICON CONSTRUCTION INC VS MERIDIAN PACIFIC CONSTRU
A Breach Of Contract/Warranty case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge Peter J. Polos presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 17, 2007
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
Category
BREACH OF CONTRACT/WARRANTY
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
2 years, 3 months and 10 days
Time To Trial
1 year, 2 months and 22 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 01/26/2010 |
|
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 01/14/2010 01:30:00 PM. |
|
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event | COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. | |
December 18, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES 12/17/2009 01:30:00 PM. |
|
December 17, 2009 | Docket Event | THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS SCHEDULED FOR 01/14/2010 AT 01:30 PMIN DEPARTMENT C27. | |
December 17, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SCHEDULED FOR 01/14/2010 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C27 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
December 08, 2009 | Docket Event | REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 12/08/2009 |
|
December 08, 2009 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 12/08/2009 |
|
December 08, 2009 | Docket Event | OBJECTION FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 12/08/2009 |
|
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY MERIDIAN PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION; ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/07/2009 |
|
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike OR TAX COSTS FILED BY MERIDIANT CORPORATION ON 12/02/2009 |
|
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10524439 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10348312. |
|
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event | DISBURSEMENT ON TRUST 2724 TO ANDRADE & ASSOC IN TRUST FOR ISSUED IN THE AMOUNT OF 83,072.78 DUE TO COURT ORDER. | |
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike OR TAX COSTS SCHEDULED FOR 01/14/2010 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C27 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION FILED BY MERIDIANT CORPORATION; ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/02/2009 |
|
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 01/05/2010 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C27 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES CONTINUED TO 12/17/2009 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. | |
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES RESCHEDULED FOR 12/17/2009 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C27 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event | THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 01/05/2010 AT 09:00 AMIN DEPARTMENT C27. | |
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES SCHEDULED FOR 12/17/2009 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C27 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 11/20/2009 10:00:00 AM. |
|
November 19, 2009 | Docket Event | EX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 11/20/2009 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C27 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
November 19, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10515846 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10339719. |
|
November 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application - OTHER (TO DELAY ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING) FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 11/19/2009 |
|
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/13/2009 11:30:00 AM. |
|
November 12, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER (PURSUANT TO STIPULATION) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/12/2009 |
|
November 12, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10511199 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10335072. |
|
November 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement FILED BY MERIDIAN PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION ON 11/12/2009 |
|
November 12, 2009 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 11/12/2009 |
|
November 12, 2009 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION; DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY J. WIND |
|
November 12, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES SCHEDULED FOR 01/07/2010 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C27 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
November 12, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 11/12/2009 |
|
November 12, 2009 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER (TO RELEASE FUNDS DEPOSITED WITH COURT PURSUANT TO INTERPLEADER) FILED BY MERIDIANT CORPORATION; ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/12/2009 |
|
November 04, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY CAPISTRANO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 11/04/2009 |
|
October 27, 2009 | Docket Event | ACCEPTANCE OF OFFER TO COMPROMISE FILED BY MERIDIANT CORPORATION; ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/27/2009 |
|
October 19, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (CROSS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE) FILED BY MERIDIANT CORPORATION ON 10/19/2009 |
|
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR BIFURCATION 10/15/2009 01:30:00 PM. |
|
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 24.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10483097 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10306971. |
|
October 02, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR BIFURCATION SCHEDULED FOR 10/15/2009 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C27 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
October 02, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR BIFURCATION RESCHEDULED FOR 10/15/2009 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C27 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
September 29, 2009 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE MOTION TO BIFURCATE/SEVER THE TRIAL AND RESOLVE LEGAL ISSUES) FILED BY CAPISTRANO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 09/29/2009 |
|
September 24, 2009 | Docket Event | REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY CAPISTRANO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT OF ORANGE COUNTY; CAPISTRANO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 09/24/2009 |
|
September 21, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR VOLUNTARY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 09/21/2009 09:00:00 AM. |
|
September 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR BIFURCATION SCHEDULED FOR 10/01/2009 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C27 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: Peter J. Polos |
|
September 03, 2009 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CAPISTRANO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 09/03/2009 |
|
September 03, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION TO BIFURCATE FILED BY CAPISTRANO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 09/03/2009 |
|
September 01, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 4.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10459528 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10283402. |
|
August 14, 2009 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/21/2009 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C27 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
July 31, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR Motion for Summary Judgment AND/OR ADJUDICATION 07/30/2009 01:30:00 PM. |
|
July 30, 2009 | Docket Event | OBJECTION FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 07/30/2009 |
|
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event | REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 07/24/2009 |
|
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event | REPLY - OTHER FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 07/24/2009 |
|
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event | RESPONSE (TO REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION) FILED BY MERIDIANT CORPORATION; ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/24/2009 |
|
July 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment AND/OR ADJUDICATION SCHEDULED FOR 07/30/2009 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C27 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
July 17, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE) FILED BY MERIDIANT CORPORATION ON 07/17/2009 |
|
July 15, 2009 | Docket Event | OBJECTION (TO EVIDENCE) FILED BY MERIDIANT CORPORATION; ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/15/2009 |
|
July 15, 2009 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION (TO MOTION) FILED BY MERIDIANT CORPORATION; ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/15/2009 |
|
July 15, 2009 | Docket Event | SEPARATE STATEMENT (IN OPPOSITION) FILED BY MERIDIANT CORPORATION; ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/15/2009 |
|
July 07, 2009 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL GENERATED |
|
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/06/2009 02:05:09 PM. |
|
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event | THE COURT, HAVING TAKEN THE ABOVE-ENTITLED MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION ON 06/25/09, NOW MAKES THE FOLLOWING RULING: . | |
June 29, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER (OF UNAVAILABILITY) FILED BY CAPISTRANO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 06/29/2009 |
|
June 25, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR Motion for Summary Judgment AND/OR ADJUDICATION 06/25/2009 01:30:00 PM. |
|
June 25, 2009 | Docket Event | MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. | |
June 25, 2009 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO JUDGE PRO TEM FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/25/2009 |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event | REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY CAPISTRANO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 06/18/2009 |
|
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION SCHEDULED FOR 06/25/2009 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C27 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION FILED BY MERIDIANT CORPORATION ON 06/12/2009 |
|
June 11, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION 06/11/2009 01:30:00 PM. |
|
June 11, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION REASSIGNED TO C27 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 06/25/2009 AT 01:30:00 PM. | |
June 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel Further Responses TO FORM INTERROGATORIES CONTINUED TO 06/25/2009 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT. | |
June 05, 2009 | Docket Event | REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY MERIDIANT CORPORATION; ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 06/05/2009 |
|
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings SCHEDULED FOR 06/25/2009 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C27 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 05/29/2009 |
|
May 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings FILED BY CAPISTRANO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 05/28/2009 |
|
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION SCHEDULED FOR 06/11/2009 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C27 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel Further Responses TO FORM INTERROGATORIES SCHEDULED FOR 06/11/2009 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C27 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 80.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10380955 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10204829. |
|
May 13, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY MERIDIANT CORPORATION ON 05/13/2009 |
|
May 13, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS FILED BY MERIDIANT CORPORATION ON 05/13/2009 |
|
April 29, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 04/29/2009 |
|
April 29, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10365829 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10189703. |
|
March 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment AND/OR ADJUDICATION SCHEDULED FOR 06/25/2009 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C27 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 38 - Motion for Summary Judgment OR ADJUDICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 200.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10333571 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10157445. |
|
March 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 03/17/2009 |
|
March 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment/ADJUDICATION FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 03/17/2009 |
|
March 17, 2009 | Docket Event | SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 03/17/2009 |
|
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR Motion for Summary Judgment AND/OR ADJUDICATION 01/15/2009 01:30:00 PM. |
|
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER (OF TRIAL) FILED BY MERIDIANT CORPORATION; ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/09/2009 |
|
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event | JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/16/2009 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C27 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
January 06, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/06/2009 09:00:00 AM. |
|
January 05, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MERIDIAN PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION ON 01/05/2009 |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION FILED BY MERIDIANT CORPORATION; ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/31/2008 |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | OBJECTION FILED BY MERIDIANT CORPORATION; ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/31/2008 |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY MERIDIANT CORPORATION; ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/31/2008 |
|
December 22, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CAPISTRANO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 12/22/2008 |
|
December 19, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 12/19/2008 |
|
November 21, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/06/2009 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C27 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. |
|
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment AND/OR ADJUDICATION SCHEDULED FOR 01/15/2009 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C27 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 38 - Motion for Summary Judgment OR ADJUDICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 200.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10230250 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10054125. |
|
October 23, 2008 | Docket Event | SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 10/23/2008 |
|
October 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment/ADJUDICATION FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 10/23/2008 |
|
October 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 10/23/2008 |
|
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO Cross-Complaint - NO FEE FILED BY MERIDIANT CORPORATION; ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/15/2008 |
|
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Cross-Complaint FILED BY CAPISTRANO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 08/25/2008 |
|
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAPISTRANO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 08/25/2008 |
|
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO Cross-Complaint - NO FEE FILED BY CAPISTRANO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 08/25/2008 |
|
July 11, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY MERIDIANT CORPORATION ON 07/11/2008 |
|
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MERIDIANT CORPORATION ON 07/01/2008 |
|
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Cross-Complaint FILED BY MERIDIANT CORPORATION ON 07/01/2008 |
|
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER (ORDER DISMISSING STAKEHOLDER DEFT. CAPISTRANO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT) FILED BY CAPISTRANO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 05/05/2008 |
|
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER (DEPOSIT OF INTERPLEADER FUNDS) FILED BY CAPISTRANO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 04/25/2008 |
|
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR INTERPLEADER DEPOSIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 83,072.78, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10102968 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 127335. |
|
April 18, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING (REQUEST TO INTERPLEAD FUNDS) FILED BY MERIDANT CORPORATION ON 04/18/2008 |
|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CAPISTRANO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 04/07/2008 |
|
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 04/03/2008 01:30:00 PM. |
|
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event | REPLY TO OPPOSITION (TO MOTION FOR ORDER) FILED BY CAPISTRANO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 03/26/2008 |
|
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - OTHER (SUPPLEMENTAL; OF MITCHELL C FREDERICK ESQ) FILED BY CAPISTRANO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 03/26/2008 |
|
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION (TO MOTION TO INTERPLEAD) FILED BY MERIDANT CORPORATION; ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/21/2008 |
|
March 10, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION - OTHER SCHEDULED FOR 04/03/2008 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C27 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER. | |
March 07, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (BY JOHN P. DACEY) FILED BY CAPISTRANO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 03/07/2008 |
|
March 07, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION - OTHER (FOR ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO INTERPLEAD FUNDS) FILED BY CAPISTRANO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 03/07/2008 |
|
January 29, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE REASSIGNED TO POLOS,PETER EFFECTIVE 01/28/2008. |
|
December 06, 2007 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO Cross-Complaint - NO FEE FILED BY CAPISTRANO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 12/06/2007 | |
November 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint (ANSWER/General Denial TO COMPLAINT/PETITION) WAS FILED BY ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/21/2007 | |
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION INC ON 11/06/2007 | |
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE - SUBSTITUTED) WAS FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION INC ON 11/06/2007 | |
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE (CERTIFICATE OF DUE DILIGENCE) WAS FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION INC ON 11/06/2007 | |
October 25, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION INC ON 10/25/2007 | |
October 24, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION INC ON 10/24/2007 | |
October 22, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE - OTHER) WAS FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION INC ON 10/22/2007 | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 10/17/2007 | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED AND FILED (Summons ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION INC ON 10/17/2007 | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY MICON CONSTRUCTION INC ON 10/17/2007 |