Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STATE OF CALIFORNIA. ET AL VS. WENDY M. VIGIL
On January 22, 2016 an other employment case was filed by State Of California Employment Development Department, against Vigil, Wendy M., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 22, 2016
Last Refreshed
March 11, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
General Employment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | State of California Employment Development Department added as a Plaintiff effective 01/22/2016 . | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Vigil, Wendy M. added as a Defendant effective 01/22/2016 . | |
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Application for Renewal of Judgment filed. |
|
May 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment . | |
May 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Judgment entered . |