Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STATE OF CALIFORNIA. ET AL VS. THOMAS J. MITCHELL
On June 10, 2003 an enforcement case was filed by State Of California Employment Development Department, against Mitchell, Thomas J., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 10, 2003
Last Refreshed
March 11, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Judgment Enforcement
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Mitchell, Thomas J added as a Defendant effective 12/05/2012 . | |
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event | State of California Employment Development Department added as a Plaintiff effective 12/05/2012 . | |
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Application for Renewal of Judgment filed. |
|