Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
UNION ADJUSTMENT CO. INC. VS. CLARENCE P. CISCO
On May 15, 2008 a contract - other case was filed by Union Adjustment Co Inc, represented by H M Bregman, against Cisco, Clarence P., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 15, 2008
Last Refreshed
March 11, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed. |
|
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 45 . | |
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Bregman, H M added as a effective 06/30/2003 . | |
May 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Union Adjustment Co Inc added as a Plaintiff effective 05/15/2008 . | |
May 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Cisco, Clarence P added as a Defendant effective 05/15/2008 . | |
May 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed. |
|