1-25 of 10000 results

Sort By

BELTRAN, AARON MICHAEL

Filed

Nov 13, 2018

Type

TRAFFIC MISDEMEANORS

BELTRAN, AARON MICHAEL

Filed

Nov 13, 2018

Type

TRAFFIC MISDEMEANORS

CAZAREZ, DEANA MAY

Filed

Nov 13, 2018

Type

TRAFFIC MISDEMEANORS

DODGE, MADISON BRIDGETTE

Filed

Nov 16, 2018

Type

TRAFFIC MISDEMEANORS

EDMAN, MICHAEL ALAN

Filed

Nov 29, 2018

Type

TRAFFIC MISDEMEANORS

RUIZ, JULIO ANDRES

Filed

Dec 19, 2018

Type

TRAFFIC MISDEMEANORS

MODTLAND, SARAH ANN

Filed

May 25, 2018

Type

TRAFFIC MISDEMEANORS

MODTLAND, SARAH ANN

Filed

May 25, 2018

Type

TRAFFIC MISDEMEANORS

JONES, ISAAC JAMES

Filed

May 30, 2018

Type

TRAFFIC MISDEMEANORS

JONES, ISAAC JAMES

Filed

May 30, 2018

Type

TRAFFIC MISDEMEANORS

LUNA, JAMES PATRICK

Filed

Jun 29, 2018

Type

TRAFFIC MISDEMEANORS

LUNA, JAMES PATRICK

Filed

Jun 29, 2018

Type

TRAFFIC MISDEMEANORS

GUARDADO, JUANITA CANTU

Filed

Jul 02, 2018

Type

TRAFFIC MISDEMEANORS

ORTEGA, MATHEW ANTHONY

Filed

Jan 10, 2019

Type

TRAFFIC MISDEMEANORS

BLASQUEZ, THOMAS GABRIEL

Filed

Dec 28, 2018

Type

TRAFFIC MISDEMEANORS

JONES, ISAAC JAMES

Filed

May 30, 2018

Type

TRAFFIC MISDEMEANORS

MARTINEZCASTRO, MORIS RANIERI

Filed

May 31, 2018

Type

TRAFFIC MISDEMEANORS

LORENZAM, CYRUS ZANE DAKOTA

Filed

Jun 20, 2018

Type

TRAFFIC MISDEMEANORS

JONES, LAUREN

Filed

Jun 27, 2018

Type

TRAFFIC MISDEMEANORS

GUARDADO, JUANITA CANTU

Filed

Jul 02, 2018

Type

TRAFFIC MISDEMEANORS

GUARDADO, JUANITA CANTU

Filed

Jul 02, 2018

Type

TRAFFIC MISDEMEANORS

GUARDADO, JUANITA CANTU

Filed

Jul 02, 2018

Type

TRAFFIC MISDEMEANORS

GRANADOS, JEREMY DAVID

Filed

Dec 28, 2018

Type

TRAFFIC MISDEMEANORS

FIGUEROA, JOSE FERNANDO

Filed

Dec 28, 2018

Type

TRAFFIC MISDEMEANORS

EDMAN, MICHAEL ALAN

Filed

Nov 29, 2018

Type

TRAFFIC MISDEMEANORS

1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 ... 400     last » 

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.