1-25 of 10000 results

Sort By

Bank of America NA vs. Christian J Evans

Filed

Sep 22, 2009

Status

Dismissed

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

WELLS FARGO BANK NA vs. Dennis M Roach

Filed

Sep 22, 2009

Status

Dismissed

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

Daniel Weisner vs. DTV Communications, Inc

Filed

Sep 22, 2009

Status

Dismissed

Type

Small Claims

American Express vs. Gilmer

Filed

Sep 22, 2009

Status

Dismissed

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

Chase Bank USA, N.A., A Corporation vs. Brenda S. Jeppesen

Filed

Sep 04, 2009

Status

Dismissed

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

Maxwell's Automotive vs. Ojai Termite-Pest Control

Filed

Sep 23, 2009

Status

Judgment Satisfied

Type

Small Claims

Midland Funding LLC vs. Lucy S Fontes

Filed

Sep 24, 2009

Status

Pending

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

Jesus G Jimenez vs Jesus Chavira Jimenez

Filed

Sep 24, 2009

Status

Dismissed

Type

Petitions - Other

Meyer Enterprises Inc vs. Jolibeth Cope

Filed

Sep 24, 2009

Status

Dismissed

Type

Small Claims

Professional Collection Consultants vs. Sugelly Ocampo

Filed

Sep 25, 2009

Status

Judgment Satisfied

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

Bay Area Credit Service LLC vs. Joaquin Fuentes

Filed

Sep 25, 2009

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

StateFarm Mutual Auto Ins. Co. vs Zimmerman

Filed

Sep 28, 2009

Status

Dismissed

Type

PI/PD/WD - Other

FIA Card Services, N.A. vs. Pete Dinatale

Filed

Sep 09, 2009

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Other Collections

DISCOVER BANK vs. Larry W Potts

Filed

Sep 15, 2009

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

Citibank South Dakota NA vs. Behrouz Nazeradl

Filed

Sep 29, 2009

Status

Dismissed

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

Capital One Bank USA NA vs. Darvine Smith

Filed

Sep 29, 2009

Status

Dismissed

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

Hilco Receivables LLC vs. Fred J Schweitzer

Filed

Sep 18, 2009

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

FIA Card Services, N.A. vs. Luis Calzada

Filed

Sep 30, 2009

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

Pacific Coast Produce, Inc. vs. Balebosta Catering Company, Inc

Filed

Sep 30, 2009

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty

CAM International vs. Barber Auto Parts Inc

Filed

Sep 22, 2009

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

Discover Bank vs. Jennifer N Nugent

Filed

Sep 22, 2009

Status

Dismissed

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

Midland Funding LLC vs. Elizabeth Teska

Filed

Sep 22, 2009

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

Chase Bank USA, N.A., A Corporation vs. Jeff S. Linderman

Filed

Sep 04, 2009

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

Linda Ann McInturff vs. Allen Richard Calvin

Filed

Sep 23, 2009

Status

Dismissed

Type

Harassment

FIA Card Services N.A. vs. Robert Bennet

Filed

Sep 03, 2009

Status

Post Judgment

Type

Rule 3.740 Collections

1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 ... 400     last » 

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.