1-25 of 10000 results

Sort By

Matter of Charles Carranza

Filed

Oct 15, 2015

Status

Dispositioned

Type

(43) Name / Gender Change

Benjamin Cogan vs Blue Herrick

Filed

Nov 03, 2015

Status

Dispositioned

Type

(32) Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer: Under 10,000

Matter of Marina Long

Filed

Nov 09, 2015

Status

Dispositioned

Type

(43) Name / Gender Change

Ruby Guillen vs Marco Monroy, et al

Filed

Feb 24, 2017

Status

Dispositioned

Type

(22) Limited Auto: 10,000 to 25,000

BRIAN FISCHER, et al vs KAREN MAJORS

Filed

Mar 01, 2017

Status

Dispositioned

Type

(06) Limited Breach of Contract / Warranty: 10,000 to 25,000

Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Synchrony Bank FKA GE Capital Retail Bank vs Sylvia Archundia

Filed

Mar 01, 2017

Status

Dispositioned

Type

(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000

Angelica Torres vs Sergio Saldate

Filed

Mar 03, 2017

Status

Dispositioned

Type

(43) Civil Harassment

Allen Property Group vs Jeremy Korn

Filed

Mar 10, 2017

Status

Dispositioned

Type

Small Claims: 1,501 - 5,000

John Ebsen vs Chris Vinson

Filed

Mar 13, 2017

Status

Dispositioned

Type

(32) Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer: Under 10,000

Oportun Inc. (formerly Progress Financial Corp.) vs Carlos Villanueva

Filed

Mar 15, 2017

Status

Dispositioned

Type

Small Claims: >12 Claims Filed

Raquel Sanchez vs Eva Iniquez

Filed

Mar 20, 2017

Status

Dispositioned

Type

(32) Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer: Under 10,000

Sea View Ranch Homeowners Association vs Pete Alvarado, et al

Filed

Mar 27, 2017

Status

Dispositioned

Type

Small Claims: 1,501 - 5,000

Cavalry SPV I, LLC vs Jennifer Garbiras, et al

Filed

Mar 29, 2017

Status

Dispositioned

Type

(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000

Lucy Famania vs Martha Bernabe

Filed

Mar 30, 2017

Status

Dispositioned

Type

(43) Civil Harassment

SUNLAN-062804, LLC, A Limited Liability Company vs David Northup

Filed

Apr 13, 2017

Status

Dispositioned

Type

(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000

Juan Rocha vs Walgreen Co.

Filed

Apr 17, 2017

Status

Dispositioned

Type

(15) Unlimited Other Employment

LVNV Funding LLC vs Malcolm Crocker

Filed

Apr 21, 2017

Status

Active

Type

(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000

Oportun Inc. (formerly Progress Financial Corp.) vs Otilia Ramos

Filed

May 09, 2017

Status

Dispositioned

Type

Small Claims: >12 Claims Filed

Oportun Inc. (formerly Progress Financial Corp.) vs Perla Munoz

Filed

May 16, 2017

Status

Dispositioned

Type

Small Claims: >12 Claims Filed

Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A. vs Margaret Oberto

Filed

May 16, 2017

Status

Dispositioned

Type

(09) Unlimited Other Collections

Kristen Ramsey vs Stacy S'gro

Filed

May 18, 2017

Status

Dispositioned

Type

Small Claims: 1,501 - 5,000

Jefferson Capital Systems LLC, et al vs Gregoria Sanchez

Filed

May 24, 2017

Status

Dispositioned

Type

(09) Limited Other Collections with Reduced Filing Fee

Kimberly Locatelli vs David Pate

Filed

May 31, 2017

Status

Dispositioned

Type

(43) Civil Harassment

Jonathan Mchenry vs City Of Santa Cruz

Filed

Jun 07, 2017

Status

Dispositioned

Type

(02) Limited Writ of Mandate: Under 10,000

1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 ... 400     last » 

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.