1-25 of 10000 results

Sort By

WINTERS -VS-JASPER

Filed

Jun 17, 1992

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Other PI/PD/WD Unlimited (23)

MASTER CONSTR. -VS-BARNARD

Filed

Jun 19, 1992

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)

COLAR -VS-LOCKHEED

Filed

Jun 23, 1992

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Other Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42)

SUN GARDEN PACKING -VS-CAMPBELL

Filed

Jul 06, 1992

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Other PI/PD/WD Unlimited (23)

MEDRANO -VS-APPLIED TECH. ASSOC.

Filed

Jul 08, 1992

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Other Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42)

HARDY JR. -VS-HEMMERLE

Filed

Jul 15, 1992

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Auto Unlimited (22)

WRIGHT -VS-WILLIAM LYON COMPANY

Filed

Jul 15, 1992

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)

DER TOROSSIAN -VS-BERKOWITZ

Filed

Jul 23, 1992

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Auto Unlimited (22)

FERRITO -VS-KELLER

Filed

Jul 23, 1992

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)

FALL RIVER TRADING CO-VS-SAN MARTIN MUSHROOMS

Filed

Jul 31, 1992

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)

OCAMPO -VS-MISRI

Filed

Jul 31, 1992

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Auto Unlimited (22)

KARNO/MARCUS -VS-BIDDLE

Filed

Jul 31, 1992

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Other Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42)

PACIFIC WESTERN BANK -VS-TLC SARATOGA ENTRERP.

Filed

Aug 03, 1992

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)

PEOPLE OF CALIF. -VS-BISCAYNE

Filed

Aug 06, 1992

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Eminent Domain/Inv Cond Unlimited (14)

KUSUMI -VS-JOHNSON

Filed

Aug 10, 1992

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Auto Unlimited (22)

SMITH -VS-J&B CARPET INSTALL.

Filed

Aug 10, 1992

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Other PI/PD/WD Unlimited (23)

HULBERG -VS-MANSON

Filed

Aug 14, 1992

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)

THE GROUP ADVANTAGE -VS-HULBERG

Filed

Aug 14, 1992

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)

HARAMIS -VS-AJLOUNY

Filed

Aug 18, 1992

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Residential Unlawful Detainer Unlimited (32)

GILLIO III -VS-DUFF

Filed

Aug 20, 1992

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Auto Unlimited (22)

HASHTECH INC. -VS-DIANATEL CORPORATION

Filed

Aug 24, 1992

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)

CENTCIRCUIT INTERNAT'-VS-BOARDTEK ELECTRONICS

Filed

Aug 28, 1992

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)

STOECKERT -VS-PRIMARY PLUS

Filed

Aug 31, 1992

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Wrongful Termination Unlimited (36)

MAGLADRY M.D. -VS-STRATHEARN

Filed

Sep 01, 1992

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Other Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42)

LEUNG -VS-PAPAGNI

Filed

Jun 25, 1992

Status

Closed/Inactive

Type

Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)

1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 ... 400     last » 

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.