1-25 of 10000 results

Sort By

The Trees LLC vs David Johnson

Filed

May 04, 2009

Status

Dismissed

Type

Small Claims in CO 12 or Fewer

Benjamin Haigh vs Pac Pizza

Filed

May 06, 2009

Status

Dismissed

Type

Unlimited Auto (22)

Deanna Jacobson vs Gilbert Martinez et al

Filed

May 06, 2009

Status

Judgment

Type

Small Claims in CO 12 or Fewer

Vahid Entezari vs Mohammad Moradi

Filed

May 11, 2009

Status

Court Finding

Type

Unlimited Other Contract (37)

Citibank South Dakota NA vs Hooshang Kermani

Filed

May 18, 2009

Status

Judgment

Type

09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited)

Financial Credit Network Inc vs Frank Maldonado

Filed

Jun 01, 2009

Status

Judgment

Type

09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited)

TTR Investments Inc vs Daniel Kepl

Filed

Jun 01, 2009

Status

Dismissed

Type

32-Unlawful Detainer-Residential Limited

Abbe Kingston vs Gail Yznaga

Filed

Jun 04, 2009

Status

Judgment

Type

32-Unlawful Detainer-Residential Limited

Baillie Brown vs Andrew Madsen

Filed

Jun 16, 2009

Status

Dismissed

Type

Small Claims in CO 12 or Fewer

Alison Hoffman vs Zachary Gilbert

Filed

Jun 16, 2009

Status

Judgment

Type

Small Claims Out of CO 12 or Fewer

Perceptioneering Inc vs PCCP West Park LLC

Filed

Jul 06, 2009

Status

Dismissed

Type

Unlimited Other Contract (37)

Petworth Industrial LP vs Cyfre LLC

Filed

Jul 15, 2009

Status

Active

Type

Unlimited Breach of Contract/Warranty (06)

Thomas Garcy vs Elizabeth Harris

Filed

Jul 21, 2009

Status

Judgment

Type

32-Unlawful Detainer-Residential Limited

Allied Interstate Incorporated vs Aurelio Cisneros

Filed

Jul 22, 2009

Status

Judgment

Type

09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited)

Joshua W Lee vs Kota Kijima

Filed

Jul 24, 2009

Status

Dismissed

Type

Unlimited Auto (22)

1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 ... 400     last »