1-25 of 10000 results

Sort By

RINO DEZORDO vs. COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, et al

Filed

May 16, 2018

Status

Active

Type

(23) Unlimited Other PI/PD/WD

5 Files

REBECCA RIVERA, et al vs. CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, et al

Filed

May 31, 2018

Status

Opened

Type

(45) Unlimited Medical Malpractice

5 Files

AMANDA NORTH vs. JONATHAN P. VANNINI, et al

Filed

Mar 27, 2018

Status

Active

Type

(06) Unlimited Breach of Contract/Warranty

24 Files

SHARMIN QURESHI vs. TODD CLAYTON, et al

Filed

Apr 10, 2018

Status

Active

Type

(06) Unlimited Breach of Contract/Warranty

14 Files

LONG NGOC T. LUU vs. FAA SERRAMONTE L, INC., AN ACTIVE CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, et al

Filed

May 14, 2018

Status

Active

Type

(07) Unlimited Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice

13 Files

HEATHER K. BUCKLE vs. THOMAS SEARING, et al

Filed

May 24, 2018

Status

Active

Type

(23) Unlimited Other PI/PD/WD

11 Files

JOE CANTON, et al vs. OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, INC., A BUSINESS ENTITY, et al

Filed

Jun 04, 2018

Status

Active

Type

(26) Unlimited Other Real Property

11 Files

LARRY GALEOTTI vs. COLLEEN ANN MCDONOUGH, et al

Filed

Feb 27, 2018

Status

Active

Type

(22) Unlimited Auto

24 Files

ERIN D DUARTE vs. YESENIA RODRIGUEZ

Filed

Sep 24, 2018

Status

Active

Type

(43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec)

5 Files

SARAH MAI BUCINI vs. RAUL ANTONIO MARTINEZ

Filed

Sep 27, 2018

Status

Active

Type

(43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec)

5 Files

CHARLES BREWER vs. SITEWORKS LANDSCAPE, INC., et al

Filed

Jan 11, 2018

Status

Active

Type

(22) Unlimited Auto

28 Files

LISA BAHN COHN, et al vs. CHRISTOPHER BONZON, et al

Filed

Jan 23, 2018

Status

Opened

Type

(45) Unlimited Medical Malpractice

6 Files

SEVERSON & WERSON, P.C. vs. MARNA SKAAR, MD, et al

Filed

Jan 26, 2018

Status

Active

Type

(06) Unlimited Breach of Contract/Warranty

12 Files

TERESITA SAN PEDRO, et al vs. FELICIANO MARTINEZ, et al

Filed

Feb 02, 2018

Status

Active

Type

(22) Unlimited Auto

7 Files

CHRISTINA RIOS vs. DIAMOND INVESTMENT PROPERTIES, INC. a California Corporation, et al

Filed

Mar 29, 2018

Status

Active

Type

(36) Unlimited Wrongful Termination

26 Files

HAEYONG KANG vs. KAREN G TEICHMANN, et al

Filed

Apr 02, 2018

Status

Active

Type

(22) Unlimited Auto

8 Files

BEKAH DU BOIS vs. ISMAEL PEREZ, et al

Filed

May 16, 2018

Status

Active

Type

(06) Unlimited Breach of Contract/Warranty

14 Files

MARIA DEL CARMEN MARTINEZ BANDA vs. AKARY CHAMERRY

Filed

May 22, 2018

Status

Active

Type

(43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec)

8 Files

STEPHANIE R. JOHNSTON vs. MARILYN HARRISON TRUST, et al

Filed

May 31, 2018

Status

Active

Type

(23) Unlimited Other PI/PD/WD

5 Files

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs. STEVEN A BROWN, et al

Filed

Jun 06, 2018

Status

Active

Type

(09) Unlimited Other Collections

7 Files

STEPPECHANGE LLC vs. VEON LTD, et al

Filed

Jun 20, 2018

Status

Active

Type

(16) Unlimited Fraud

16 Files

RE: ALEXANDRA BREITMAN

Filed

Jun 29, 2018

Status

Active

Type

(43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec)

6 Files

CHERYL ROGERS vs. AJ VASQUEZ, et al

Filed

May 31, 2018

Status

Active

Type

(26) Unlimited Other Real Property

10 Files

DONALD KUNG vs. RALPH LU, et al

Filed

Jun 19, 2018

Status

Active

Type

(23) Unlimited Other PI/PD/WD

13 Files

JAIFU HADERO TAREKEGN vs. MARIA DE ROSARIO ZEPEDA SOBERANES, et al

Filed

Jun 20, 2018

Status

Active

Type

(22) Unlimited Auto

8 Files

1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 ... 400     last » 

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.