1-25 of 10000 results

Sort By

Bank of America, N.A. vs Craig D Young

Filed

Mar 10, 2016

Status

Disposed - May 19, 2017

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

6 Files

Discover Bank vs Jennie Aragon

Filed

Mar 18, 2016

Status

Disposed - Sep 15, 2016

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

16 Files

Fellowship Financial Enterprises Corporation vs Adelina Castellanos

Filed

Mar 08, 2016

Status

Disposed - Dec 2, 2016

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

16 Files

Lobel Financial Corp., a California Corporation vs Mark Delmonte

Filed

Mar 29, 2016

Status

Disposed - Mar 16, 2018

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

8 Files

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc vs Adeel Ahmed

Filed

Apr 05, 2016

Status

Disposed - Aug 17, 2016

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

6 Files

OneMain Financial Group, LLC vs Aaron Henderson

Filed

Apr 14, 2016

Status

Disposed - Oct 12, 2016

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

5 Files

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs Marie Gurnard

Filed

Apr 22, 2016

Status

Disposed - Jan 4, 2017

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

12 Files

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs Cheyenne Palmer

Filed

Apr 21, 2016

Status

Disposed - Dec 7, 2016

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

10 Files

PMGI, Financial, LLC vs Michael Mercado

Filed

Apr 26, 2016

Status

Conditional Settlement - May 4, 2017

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

13 Files

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. vs Eduardo Delatorre

Filed

Apr 27, 2016

Status

Disposed - Sep 21, 2016

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

9 Files

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs Michelle Zazueta

Filed

May 24, 2016

Status

Disposed - Aug 24, 2016

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

8 Files

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs Crissy Yancy

Filed

May 24, 2016

Status

Disposed - Dec 9, 2016

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

11 Files

Springleaf Financial Services Inc. vs John D Fishburn et al.

Filed

May 31, 2016

Status

Disposed - Oct 7, 2016

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

8 Files

Kings Credit Services, A Corporation vs Jennifer R McDaniel

Filed

Jun 27, 2016

Status

Disposed - Dec 2, 2016

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

12 Files

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs Gwenoolyn Turnernelson

Filed

Jul 13, 2016

Status

Disposed - Dec 7, 2016

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

11 Files

Northern California Collection Service, Inc. vs J.R. Drywall, Inc., A California Corporation

Filed

Jul 27, 2016

Status

Disposed - Dec 22, 2016

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

11 Files

Stanislaus Credit Control Service, Inc vs Jose M Castro et al.

Filed

Jul 28, 2016

Status

Disposed - Dec 7, 2016

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

15 Files

Cavalry SPV I, LLC vs Teri Rhynes

Filed

Aug 01, 2016

Status

Disposed - Apr 10, 2017

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

15 Files

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs Kismet Caslib

Filed

Mar 10, 2016

Status

Disposed - Sep 14, 2016

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

10 Files

Midland Funding LLC vs Rolando Q Raymundo

Filed

Mar 21, 2016

Status

Disposed - Nov 3, 2016

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

10 Files

Discover Bank vs Nadine Serbantes

Filed

Apr 01, 2016

Status

Disposed - Dec 20, 2016

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

7 Files

Bank Of America, N.A. vs Barbara L Elliott

Filed

Apr 04, 2016

Status

Disposed - Jun 26, 2017

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

6 Files

Sterling Jewelers vs Donald A. Dennis et al.

Filed

Apr 08, 2016

Status

Pending - Apr 8, 2016

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

13 Files

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc vs Christiane M Graves

Filed

Apr 14, 2016

Status

Disposed - May 27, 2016

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

6 Files

Lobel Financial Corp. vs Donnell J. Bell et al.

Filed

Apr 20, 2016

Status

Disposed - Dec 21, 2017

Type

Limited Civil Collection Rule 3.740

13 Files

1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 ... 400     last » 

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.